This case was last updated from Waupaca County Courts on 02/09/2022 at 00:53:34 (UTC).

Torborg Lumber vs. Little Ritchie Construction

Case Summary

On 10/27/2021 Torborg Lumber filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Little Ritchie Construction. This case was filed in Waupaca County Courts, Waupaca County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Huber, Raymond and Vedral, Doreen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0594

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Waupaca, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Huber, Raymond

Vedral, Doreen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Torborg Lumber

Waupaca, WI 54981

Defendants

Little Ritchie Construction

N3659 River Valley Ln

Weyauwega, WI 54983

Ritchie, James

Weyauwega, WI 54983

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Huber, Raymond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Huber, Raymond; Additional Text: Judgment amended to include service fees of $75.00, incurred by plaintiff for contempt proceeding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Contempt hearing; Court Official: Huber, Raymond; Court Reporter: Coulthart, Rose; Additional Text: 1:20 PM Kristen Konkol appears in court on behalf of Torborg Lumber. No appearance by Mr. Ritchie. COS filed w/the Court. Based on Mr. Ritchie's non appearance, the Court will find Mr. Ritchie in contempt and sentences him to the county jail for a period of 10 days, but will stay for a period of 15 days. The Court directs Mr. Ritchie may purge the contempt by either paying the judgment in full, including the $75.00 service fees (to be added to the judgment) or completing a FDS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Additional Text: Defendant was served with contempt motion.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Motion and order for hearing on contempt; Court Official: Huber, Raymond; Additional Text: Copies to plaintiff for personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Service instructions to plaintiff for contempt hearing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Motion and prop. order for hearing on contempt; Additional Text: Motion and Proposed Order for Hearing on Contempt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Vedral, Doreen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Huber, Raymond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Huber, Raymond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: WAUPACA; Case number: 2021SC000594; Caption: Torborg Lumber vs. Little Ritchie Construction; Total Amount: $6473.58; Property/Remarks: Judgment amended to include service fees of $75.00, incurred by plaintiff for contempt proceeding. Defendant was found in contempt and sentenced to 10 days in jail. Sentence stayed for a period of 15 days. The defendant may purge by paying the judgment in full or by submitting a completed and signed financial statement.; Judgment Party; Party Name: Torborg Lumber; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1682 Royalton St., Waupaca, WI 54981; Judgment Party; Party Name: Little Ritchie Construction; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: N3659 River Valley Ln, Weyauwega, WI 54983; Judgment Party; Party Name: James Ritchie; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: N3659 River Valley Ln, Weyauwega, WI 54983; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $6302.08; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $75.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Vedral, Doreen; Additional Text: Plaintiff appeared by letter. No appearance by defendant. Default judgment entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Complaint - Smalls Claims

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $96.5; Additional Text: 21R 011002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letter of appearance by plaintiff; Additional Text: Letter of Appearance and request for Judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    Read MoreRead Less