This case was last updated from Monroe County Wisconsin Courts on 01/24/2022 at 04:13:18 (UTC).

Tidewater Finance Company vs. Matthew Moran Jr

Case Summary

On 08/03/2021 Tidewater Finance Company filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Matthew Moran Jr. This case was filed in Monroe County Wisconsin Courts, Monroe County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Radcliffe, Richard. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0167

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Monroe, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Radcliffe, Richard

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tidewater Finance Company

6520 Indian River Road

Virginia Beach, VA 23464

Tidewater Motor Credit

Virginia Beach, VA 23464

Defendant

Moran Jr, Matthew

Tomah, WI 54660

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hammond, Kim M

Gollnick, James W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: MONROE; Case number: 2021CV000167; Caption: Tidewater Finance Company vs. Matthew Moran Jr; Total Amount: $17270.83; Judgment Party; Party Name: Tidewater Finance Company; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 6520 Indian River Road, Virginia Beach, VA 23464 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Matthew Moran Jr; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 21972 Glasgow Avenue, Tomah, WI 54660 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $16645.33; Costs/Amount; Description: Civil filing fee; Amount: $285.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $85.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $250.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for judgment/judgment; Court Official: Radcliffe, Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default Judgment; Court Official: Radcliffe, Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Radcliffe, Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of motion, motion; Additional Text: Notice of Motion and Motion for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of no answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for judgment/prop. judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Matthew Moran Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 006053, Payable Number: 164393, Receipt Number: 21RT003194, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gollnick, James W