This case was last updated from Eau Claire County Courts on 01/22/2022 at 19:30:17 (UTC).

Theodore W. Nagel et al vs. Haas Sons, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 Theodore W Nagel filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Haas Sons, Inc. This case was filed in Eau Claire County Courts, Eau Claire County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Manydeeds, John F and Theisen, Jon M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0160

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Eau Claire, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Manydeeds, John F

Theisen, Jon M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nagel, Theodore W.

Cornell, WI 54732

Nagel, Patricia

Cornell, WI 54732

Defendants

Haas Sons, Inc.

203 E Birch Street, Brenda Henke

Thorp, WI 54771

Indemnity Insurance Company of North America

301 South Bedford Street, Suite 1, Ct Corporation System

Madison, WI 53703

United States Department of Veterans Affairs

222 West Washington Avenue, Suite 700, Megan R. Stelljes

Madison, WI 53703

Secura Insurance, A Mutual Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Parsons, Robert A.

Defendant Attorneys

Hills, Rick E.

Freiman, Amy Marie

Stelljes, Megan R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2022
  • HearingDescription: Telephone scheduling conference; Court Official: Manydeeds, John F.; Location: Branch 1 by phone; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Expert witness list - plaintiff; Additional Text: Plaintiffs' List of Experts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Appearance; Additional Text: by Atty. Amy Freiman on behalf of Defendants- Haas Sons, Inc. and Secura Insurance, A Mutual Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Appearance; Additional Text: of Attorney Rick Hills on behalf of Defendants Haas Sons, Inc. and Secura Ins.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation and Order; Court Official: Manydeeds, John F.; Additional Text: to amend caption: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: That Secura Insurance, A Mutual Company be substituted as party in place of ABC Insurance Co.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. stipulation and prop. order; Additional Text: to Amend Caption

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Scheduling order; Court Official: Manydeeds, John F.; Additional Text: of 07.14.21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Telephone scheduling conference on May 10, 2022 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Appearance; Additional Text: of Attorney Rick Hills on behalf of Defendant Haas Sons, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Party To Serve: Haas Sons, Inc Document Served: Summons and Complaint, Electronic Filing Notice, Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents Date Served: 05/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Party To Serve: Indemnity Insurance Company of North America Document Served: Electronic Filing Notice, Summons and Complaint Date Served: 04/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order assigning judge/judicial assignment order; Court Official: Manydeeds, John F.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of assignment of judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Application for specific judicial assign approved; Court Official: Theisen, Jon M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Request for substitution; Additional Text: Plaintiff's

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 106684, Payable Number: 255638, Receipt Number: 21R 009356, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Freiman, Amy Marie

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hills, Rick E.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stelljes, Megan R.