This case was last updated from Green County Courts on 02/03/2022 at 17:35:38 (UTC).

The Monroe Clinic Inc. vs. Ryan A Weiss et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 The Monroe Clinic Inc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Ryan A Weiss. This case was filed in Green County Courts, Green County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Vale, Thomas J and Warner, Jessie J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0220

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Green, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Vale, Thomas J

Warner, Jessie J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Monroe Clinic Inc.

515 22Nd Avenue

Monroe, WI 53566

Defendants

Weiss, Ryan A

Monroe, WI 53566

Weiss, Amanda K

Monroe, WI 53566

Garnishee

Grande Cheese

Fond Du Lac, WI 54935

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Westrick, David

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 003709, Payable Number: 87225, Receipt Number: 21R 005954, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 003709, Payable Number: 87225, Receipt Number: 21R 005954, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 003393, Payable Number: 86907, Receipt Number: 21R 005470, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: GREEN; Case number: 2021SC000220; Caption: The Monroe Clinic Inc. vs. Ryan A Weiss et al; Total Amount: $2241.34; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Ryan A Weiss; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2240 5th Ave., Monroe, WI 53566 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Amanda K Weiss; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2240 5th Ave., Monroe, WI 53566 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: The Monroe Clinic Inc.; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 515 22nd Avenue, Monroe, WI 53566 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $2084.34; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Vale, Thomas J; Court Reporter: Severson, Denise; Additional Text: Defendant Ryan A Weiss not in court. Attorney David Westrick appeared by video means for Plaintiff The Monroe Clinic Inc..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Vale, Thomas J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Warner, Jessie J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Vale, Thomas J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $118.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 001756, Payable Number: 85507, Receipt Number: 21R 002873, Amount: $118.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on May 10, 2021 at 10:00 am. NOH to parties INSTRUCTIONS HOW TO APPEAR REMOTELY (scheduled court events are currently held via video/telephone conferencing - Pursuant to the Courts Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Westrick, David