This case was last updated from Green County Courts on 02/03/2022 at 17:35:06 (UTC).

The Monroe Clinic Inc. vs. Bret L Ward

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 The Monroe Clinic Inc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Bret L Ward. This case was filed in Green County Courts, Green County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Bawinkel, Angela and Vale, Thomas J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0223

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Green, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Bawinkel, Angela

Vale, Thomas J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Monroe Clinic Inc.

515 22Nd Avenue

Monroe, WI 53566

Defendant

Ward, Bret L

Juda, WI 53550

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Westrick, David

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Satisfaction of judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Satisfaction of judgment fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 002970, Payable Number: 86621, Receipt Number: 21R 004919, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Full satisfaction; Amount: $8800.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: GREEN; Case number: 2021SC000223; Caption: The Monroe Clinic Inc. vs. Bret L Ward; Total Amount: $8800.17; Satisfaction: Full; Judgment Party; Party Name: Bret L Ward; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: W1882 Giese Rd, Juda, WI 53550 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: The Monroe Clinic Inc.; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 515 22nd Avenue, Monroe, WI 53566 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $8533.67; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0; Civil Judgement Events; Date: 2021-07-06; Type: Full satisfaction; Amount: $8800.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Vale, Thomas J; Court Reporter: Severson, Denise; Additional Text: Attorney David Westrick appeared by video means for Plaintiff The Monroe Clinic Inc.. Defendant Bret L Ward not in court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Vale, Thomas J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Bawinkel, Angela

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Vale, Thomas J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 001759, Payable Number: 85507, Receipt Number: 21R 002873, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on May 10, 2021 at 10:00 am. NOH to parties INSTRUCTIONS HOW TO APPEAR REMOTELY (scheduled court events are currently held via video/telephone conferencing - Pursuant to the Courts Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Westrick, David