This case was last updated from Columbia County Wisconsin Courts on 02/04/2022 at 21:24:33 (UTC).

TD BANK USA, N.A. vs. JUDITH MANTEUFEL

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 TD BANK USA, N A filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against JUDITH MANTEUFEL. This case was filed in Columbia County Wisconsin Courts, Columbia County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Voigt, W. Andrew and Whaley, April L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0371

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Voigt, W. Andrew

Whaley, April L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA, N.A.

7000 Target Pkwy North Ms-Ncb-0464

Minneapolis, MN 55445

Defendant

MANTEUFEL, JUDITH

Columbus, WI 53925

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lower, Austin J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Voigt, W. Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: Voigt, W. Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letter of dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Adjourned return date on July 16, 2021 at 09:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from Kohn Law Firm. Requests case be adjourned to July 16, 2021 to allow additional time for the defendant's payment to clear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of substitute service; Additional Text: 6/2/21 Maria Manteufel was sub-served the Summons and Complaint for Judith Manteufel $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Additional Text: w/ attached Summary of Account Activity

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 004206, Payable Number: 159242, Receipt Number: 21R 007650, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lower, Austin J