This case was last updated from Waukesha County Courts on 02/08/2022 at 06:39:56 (UTC).

Synchrony Bank vs. CHRISTY ANDERSON

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 Synchrony Bank filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHRISTY ANDERSON. This case was filed in Waukesha County Courts, Waukesha County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Paz, Monica and Herring, David. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2895

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Waukesha, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Paz, Monica

Herring, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Synchrony Bank

170 Election Road, Suite 125

Draper, UT 84020

Defendant

ANDERSON, CHRISTY

Oconomowoc, WI 53066-5826

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paleka, Kayla A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Paz, Monica

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Herring, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: WAUKESHA; Case number: 2021SC002895; Caption: Synchrony Bank vs. CHRISTY ANDERSON; Total Amount: $3012.96; Judgment Party; Party Name: CHRISTY ANDERSON; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 318 FREDERICK CT, Oconomowoc, WI 53066-5826 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Synchrony Bank; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 170 ELECTION ROAD, SUITE 125, Draper, UT 84020 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $2666.91; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $81.55; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Herring, David; Additional Text: 03:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Herring, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Dated 11-05-21, Filed by Atty Paleka requesting Judgement Plus Cost

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of publication; Additional Text: filed as to the Return Date of 11/08/2021, filed by Attorney Paleka.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing; Additional Text: Filed by Atty Paleka

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Publication summons; Additional Text: filed as to the 11/8/2021 Return Date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Adjourned return date; Additional Text: Return Date adjourned to 11/08/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of non-service; Additional Text: Affidavit of Non-Service: Attempted service of an Authenticated Summons and Complaint as to the defendant, Christy Anderson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: Amount on complaint:$2,666.91 Declaration of nonmilitary service as to: Christy Anderson Service as to: All Cost of Service and/or Publication: $60.00/$21.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Small Claims Information sheet to be attached to all copies of Summons and Complaint for service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Small Claims And Eviction Exhibit Process Information Sheet, to be attached to all small claims forms for service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Court Official: Herring, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: with Military Status Report filed as to Christy Anderson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Proposed Exhibit, Summary of Account dated 4/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 037203, Payable Number: 447838, Receipt Number: 21R 040711, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paleka, Kayla A