This case was last updated from Winnebago County Courts on 02/08/2022 at 03:15:00 (UTC).

Synchrony Bank vs. BRITTANY CLARK

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 Synchrony Bank filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against BRITTANY CLARK. This case was filed in Winnebago County Courts, Winnebago County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Keberlein, Bryan D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2121

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Winnebago, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Keberlein, Bryan D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Synchrony Bank

170 Election Road, Suite 125

Draper, UT 84020

Defendant

CLARK, BRITTANY

Eureka, WI 54963-9677

Garnishee

Jeff's on Rugby

Oshkosh, WI 54902

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

Paleka, Kayla A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 000184, Payable Number: 313161, Receipt Number: 22R 000240, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 000184, Payable Number: 313161, Receipt Number: 22R 000240, Amount: $92.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Keberlein, Bryan D.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Keberlein, Bryan D.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: WINNEBAGO; Case number: 2021SC002121; Caption: Synchrony Bank vs. BRITTANY CLARK; Total Amount: $1382.78; Judgment Party; Party Name: BRITTANY CLARK; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 3008 FLORENCE ST, EUREKA, WI 54963-9677 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Synchrony Bank; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 170 ELECTION ROAD, SUITE 125, Draper, UT 84020 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1116.28; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $22.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Keberlein, Bryan D.; Additional Text: Plaintiff Synchrony Bank and Attorney Kayla A Paleka not in court. Defendant BRITTANY CLARK not in court. Default judgment granted. NEJ/Judgment with FDS mailed to parties.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Keberlein, Bryan D.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Letter requesting REDUCED JUDGMENT AMOUNT OF $1,116.28 PLUS COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on November 17, 2021 at 11:00 am.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on November 17, 2021 at 11:00 am.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Request; Additional Text: Request to Reschedule

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on October 20, 2021 at 11:00 am.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on October 20, 2021 at 11:00 am.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on October 20, 2021 at 11:00 am.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Additional Text: $2,116.28 / EUREKA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 507211, Payable Number: 307862, Receipt Number: 21R 029097, Amount: $116.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paleka, Kayla A