This case was last updated from Winnebago County Courts on 01/23/2022 at 02:41:25 (UTC).

Surgical Associates of Neenah, S.C. vs. Julie A. Thompson

Case Summary

On 05/11/2021 Surgical Associates of Neenah, S C filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Julie A Thompson. This case was filed in Winnebago County Courts, Winnebago County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Haase, LaKeisha D and Pingel, Melissa M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0312

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Winnebago, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Haase, LaKeisha D

Pingel, Melissa M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Surgical Associates of Neenah, S.C.

2 Neenah Center, Suite 100, C/O Remley Law, Sc

Neenah, WI 54956

Defendant

Thompson, Julie A.

Appleton, WI 54913

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Read, Renee A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 337697, Payable Number: 301736, Receipt Number: 21R 017499, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: WINNEBAGO; Case number: 2021CV000312; Caption: Surgical Associates of Neenah, S.C. vs. Julie A. Thompson; Total Amount: $17025.32; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Surgical Associates of Neenah, S.C.; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2 Neenah Center, Suite 100, c/o Remley Law, SC, Neenah, WI 54956 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Julie A. Thompson; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 4963 W. Wood Creek Ln., Appleton, WI 54913 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Civil filing fee; Amount: $265.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Electronic Filing Fee; Amount: $20.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $250.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $51.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $16433.82; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0; Civil Judgement Events; Date: 2021-07-20; Type: Transcript issued; Amount: $5.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Motion for default judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: Affidavit of Renee A. Read

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: Bill of Costs with Supporting Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: for Judgment & Default Judgment- sent to Judge for review.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Haase, LaKeisha D.; Additional Text: Order for Judgment & Default Judgment- sent to civil clerks for processing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Bill of costs; Court Official: Pingel, Melissa M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: mailed to Plaintiff's Attorney re: docketing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Julie A. Thompson - 05/11/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 282529, Payable Number: 300520, Receipt Number: 21R 014846, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Read, Renee A.