This case was last updated from Wood County Wisconsin Courts on 02/08/2022 at 15:04:55 (UTC).

SUNAR PROPERTIES, LLC vs. CHARRISE CUMBERLAND

Case Summary

On 10/08/2021 SUNAR PROPERTIES, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHARRISE CUMBERLAND. This case was filed in Wood County Wisconsin Courts, Wood County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Kreuser, Jacalyn A and Weymouth, Richard. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0912

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Wood, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Kreuser, Jacalyn A

Weymouth, Richard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUNAR PROPERTIES, LLC

2500 48Th Street South

Wisconsin Rapids, WI 54494

Defendant

CUMBERLAND, CHARRISE

Wisc Rapids, WI 54494

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: WOOD; Case number: 2021SC000912; Caption: SUNAR PROPERTIES, LLC vs. CHARRISE CUMBERLAND; Total Amount: $5086.33; Judgment Party; Party Name: CHARRISE CUMBERLAND; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2100 Sherri Lane Apt 101, Wisc Rapids, WI 54494; Judgment Party; Party Name: SUNAR PROPERTIES, LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2500 48th Street South, Wisconsin Rapids, WI 54494 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $4948.43; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $23.4; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Court trial; Court Official: Weymouth, Richard; Court Reporter: DAR - BRANCH 1, UNMONITORED; Additional Text: 02:57 PM Plaintiff SUNAR PROPERTIES, LLC in court. Defendant CHARRISE CUMBERLAND not in court. Court grants default judgment in the amount of 44948.43 plus costs and fees.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Weymouth, Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Weymouth, Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Weymouth, Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Damage list; Additional Text: letter stating items requested for amount 1. Lease Amendment and Lease Agreement; 2. Rent Journal; 3. 5 Day Notice to Pay Rent; 4. Email from Duraclean; 5. Replacement Carpet costs; 6. Cleaning charges, etc; 7. Water and Sewer bills; 8. Painting charges; 9. Kitchen and Bath Cabinets Costs; Damage Pictures 5B Damage Pictures Ex 5C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for CUMBERLAND, CHARRISE; Additional Text: Fast Forwarded; ADDRESS INFO for CHARRISE CUMBERLAND Current: 2100 Sherri Lane Apt 101, Wisc Rapids, WI 54494 United States (Effective: 12-15-2021) Prior: 361 1ST STREET - APT. 7, Port Edwards, WI 54469 US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Pre-trial conference; Court Official: Weymouth, Richard; Court Reporter: DAR - RESERVE, UNMONITORED; Additional Text: 01:02 PM Defendant CHARRISE CUMBERLAND in court. Plaintiff SUNAR PROPERTIES, LLC in court. The parties did not come to an agreement so this matter will be set for a trial. Court trial scheduled for January 5, 2022 at 02:45 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Court trial on January 5, 2022 at 02:45 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Responsible court official changed; Court Official: Weymouth, Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Kreuser, Jacalyn A; Additional Text: 01:23 PM Plaintiff SUNAR PROPERTIES, LLC in court. Defendant CHARRISE CUMBERLAND in court. Pre-trial conference scheduled for December 8, 2021 at 01:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Contested; Court Official: Kreuser, Jacalyn A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Pre-trial conference on December 8, 2021 at 01:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Amount: $23.4; Additional Text: 10/09/21; Charisse Cumberland; S&C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Amount: $4948.43; Additional Text: 361 1st St Apt 7, Port Edwards WI 54469

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 010055, Payable Number: 129831, Receipt Number: 21R 009567, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less