This case was last updated from Sauk County Courts on 02/08/2022 at 02:40:03 (UTC).

Summit Credit Union vs. Olivia Garza

Case Summary

On 09/20/2021 Summit Credit Union filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Olivia Garza. This case was filed in Sauk County Courts, Sauk County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is O'Rourke, Debra V. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1093

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sauk, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

O'Rourke, Debra V

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Summit Credit Union

1709 Landmark Dr.

Cottage Grove, WI 53527

Defendant

Garza, Olivia

Wisconsin Dells, WI 53965

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Turke, Mary Carolyn

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 013118, Payable Number: 245201, Receipt Number: 21R 021643, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: O'Rourke, Debra V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: O'Rourke, Debra V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: SAUK; Case number: 2021SC001093; Caption: Summit Credit Union vs. Olivia Garza; Total Amount: $8484.64; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Olivia Garza; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 212 Winnebago Lane, Wisconsin Dells, WI 53965 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Summit Credit Union; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1709 Landmark Dr., Cottage Grove, WI 53527 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $8112.26; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $107.88; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Other; Amount: $20.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: O'Rourke, Debra V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: O'Rourke, Debra V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication; Additional Text: Affidavit; Publication fee $32.88

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Publication summons; Additional Text: Publication Summons and Notice (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of non-service; Additional Text: on Olivia Garza; $75.00 SF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Clerk Instruction Letter; adjournment request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Complaint - Smalls Claims; Additional Text: Money demand for $8,112.26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 010061, Payable Number: 243508, Receipt Number: 21R 018246, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Turke, Mary Carolyn