This case was last updated from Juneau County Courts on 01/22/2022 at 22:45:49 (UTC).

State of Wisconsin vs. JEFFERY M HATFIELD et al

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 State of Wisconsin filed an Other lawsuit against JEFFERY M HATFIELD. This case was filed in Juneau County Courts, Juneau County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Smith, Stacy A and Curran, Paul S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0081

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Juneau, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Smith, Stacy A

Curran, Paul S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State of Wisconsin

Wi

Defendants

HATFIELD, JEFFERY M

Necedah, WI 54646

Hatfield, Jeffrey M.

Necedah, WI 54646

HATFIELD, JEFFERY MARK

Necedah, WI 54646

$4557.00 in U.S. Currency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hamm, Kenneth John

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Smith, Stacy A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other; Court Official: Smith, Stacy A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Status conference; Court Official: Smith, Stacy A.; Court Reporter: Michalewicz, Mary; Additional Text: 01:04 PM Plaintiff State of Wisconsin in court with attorney Kenneth John Hamm. Defendant JEFFERY M HATFIELD in court with Michael E Covey - special appearance. STATE: Parties stipulate. COURT: State to draft order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Status conference on August 3, 2021 at 12:45 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Status conference; Court Official: Smith, Stacy A.; Court Reporter: Michalewicz, Mary; Additional Text: 09:09 AM JEFFERY M HATFIELD in custody, Attorney Michael Covey-special appearance. Plaintiff State of Wisconsin in court with attorney Kenneth John Hamm. COVEY: Parties stip money does not belong to def. STATE: Will file stip. COURT: DA to file stip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Status conference on June 29, 2021 at 09:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Status conference; Court Official: Curran, Paul S.; Court Reporter: Gottschalk, Nicole; Additional Text: Plaintiff State of Wisconsin in court with attorney Joshua Andreasen via zoom. Defendant JEFFERY M HATFIELD in court, in custody via zoom. with Michael E. Covey in person. Tracking w/case 21-CF-90 Pre-trial conference scheduled for June 9, 2021 at 09:30 am. Status conference scheduled for August 3, 2021 at 12:45 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Additional Text: Currency (4/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Additional Text: Jeffery Mark Hatfield (4/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Forfeiture summons & complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Forfeiture summons & complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: Forfeiture Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less