This case was last updated from Dodge County Courts on 02/01/2022 at 05:24:23 (UTC).

Short Term Financial, LLC vs. JACQUELINE MUENCH

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 Short Term Financial, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against JACQUELINE MUENCH. This case was filed in Dodge County Courts, Dodge County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Seim, Steven. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0122

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Dodge, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Seim, Steven

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Short Term Financial, LLC

2400 E. Devon Ave, Suite 300

Des Plaines, IL 60018

Defendant

MUENCH, JACQUELINE

Mayville, WI 53050

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Duppler, Cynthia A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice; Additional Text: Flynn Restaurant Group, LLC $2296.73

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 114849, Payable Number: 236063, Receipt Number: 21R 019522, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 114849, Payable Number: 236063, Receipt Number: 21R 019522, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 020549, Payable Number: 227395, Receipt Number: 21R 003903, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: DODGE; Case number: 2021SC000122; Caption: Short Term Financial, LLC vs. JACQUELINE MUENCH; Total Amount: $2107.41; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: JACQUELINE MUENCH; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 30 S GERMAN ST, Mayville, WI 53050 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Short Term Financial, LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2400 E. Devon Ave, Suite 300, Des Plaines, IL 60018 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1840.91; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Seim, Steven; Court Reporter: Recording System; Additional Text: Attorney Robert Nailen in court for Plaintiff Short Term Financial, LLC. Defendant JACQUELINE MUENCH not in court. Default judgment granted for amount requested plus applicable court costs.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Seim, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Seim, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Seim, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Additional Text: $1840.91

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 010029, Payable Number: 226076, Receipt Number: 21R 001390, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Loan Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Loan Transactions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Duppler, Cynthia A