This case was last updated from Washington County Wisconsin Courts on 02/04/2022 at 00:30:41 (UTC).

Short Term Financial, LLC vs. AUSTIN SMITH

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 Short Term Financial, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against AUSTIN SMITH. This case was filed in Washington County Wisconsin Courts, Washington County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Pouros, James G and Russell, Theresa M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0449

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Washington, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Pouros, James G

Russell, Theresa M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Short Term Financial, LLC

2400 E. Devon Ave, Suite 300

Des Plaines, IL 60018

Defendant

SMITH, AUSTIN

West Bend, WI 53090

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mackelly, Meghan Patricia

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 097447, Payable Number: 157059, Receipt Number: 21R 012902, Amount: $5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Russell, Theresa M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Pouros, James G.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: WASHINGTON; Case number: 2021SC000449; Caption: Short Term Financial, LLC vs. AUSTIN SMITH; Total Amount: $3894.92; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: AUSTIN SMITH; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2116 DEERFIELD DR, West Bend, WI 53090 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Short Term Financial, LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2400 E. DEVON AVE, SUITE 300, Des Plaines, IL 60018 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $3553.93; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $76.49; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Russell, Theresa M; Additional Text: No appearance by defendant; default judgment for plaintiff in the amount of $3,553.93, plus costs.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Russell, Theresa M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of publication; Amount: $40.49; Additional Text: of Publication Summons for hearing on 6/14/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Publication summons; Additional Text: for 6/14/2021 Return Date at 9:00 a.m.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing; Additional Text: on 5/26/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of non-service; Amount: $36.0; Additional Text: of Summons & Complaint on Austin Smith

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Amended summons and complaint; Amount: $3553.93

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Amount: $3553.93; Additional Text: Return Date: 5/24/21 at 9:00 a.m.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 059507, Payable Number: 155464, Receipt Number: 21R 009043, Amount: $114.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Loan Agreement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Loan transaction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mackelly, Meghan Patricia