This case was last updated from Kenosha County Courts on 02/07/2022 at 19:25:36 (UTC).

Short Term Financial, LLC DBA Americash Loans vs. Roshonya Mason

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 Short Term Financial, LLC DBA Americash Loans filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Roshonya Mason. This case was filed in Kenosha County Courts, Kenosha County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Dowse, Geoffrey, Iverson, Heather and Kupfer, Robert. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2337

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kenosha, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Dowse, Geoffrey

Iverson, Heather

Kupfer, Robert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Short Term Financial, LLC DBA Americash Loans

2400 E. Devon Ave Suite 300

Des Plaines, IL 60018

Defendant

Mason, Roshonya

Kenosha, WI 53144

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stueckroth, Richard E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 675165, Payable Number: 333352, Receipt Number: 21R 033454, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: KENOSHA; Case number: 2021SC002337; Caption: Short Term Financial, LLC DBA Americash Loans vs. Roshonya Mason; Total Amount: $3978.92; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Roshonya Mason; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 5418 42ND AVE, Kenosha, WI 53144 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Short Term Financial, LLC DBA Americash Loans; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2400 E. Devon Ave Suite 300, Des Plaines, IL 60018 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $3612.46; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $36.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Other; Amount: $65.96

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Appearance; Court Official: Iverson, Heather; Additional Text: 10:34 AM Clerk: Mindy I. Plaintiff appears by Attorney Estes. No appearance by the Defendant. Default money judgment entered plus costs.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Iverson, Heather

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Iverson, Heather

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Iverson, Heather

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Attempted service; Additional Text: of Summons and Complaint as to Roshonya Mason ($36.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Appearance; Court Official: Kupfer, Robert; Court Reporter: CD; Additional Text: 10:52 AM Attorney Richard E Stueckroth in court for Plaintiff Short Term Financial, LLC DBA Americash Loans. Defendant Roshonya Mason in court. Clerk: R. Brickner. Case Adjourned to complete service. Adjourned return date scheduled for December 2, 2021 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Adjourned return date on December 2, 2021 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication; Additional Text: $65.96

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Publication summons; Additional Text: hearing to be held on 10-28-2021 at 10:00 a.m. Rm 300

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing; Additional Text: of Summons and Complaint as to Roshonya Mason on 10-13-2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Dobberstein requesting adjournment to 10-28-2021 at 10:00 a.m. - pub

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Court Official: Dowse, Geoffrey; Additional Text: $3612.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 502819, Payable Number: 328324, Receipt Number: 21R 024967, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Loan agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Loan transaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Additional Text: of proper attire and decorum

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stueckroth, Richard E