This case was last updated from Jefferson County Wisconsin Courts on 02/07/2022 at 04:43:09 (UTC).

Short Term Financial, L.L.C dba Americash Loans vs. MISHELL DRAEGER

Case Summary

On 08/25/2021 Short Term Financial, L L C dba Americash Loans filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against MISHELL DRAEGER. This case was filed in Jefferson County Wisconsin Courts, Jefferson County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Hue, William F, Hartley, Brian C, Weber, Jennifer and Hamre Incha, Cindy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0769

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Hue, William F

Hartley, Brian C

Weber, Jennifer

Hamre Incha, Cindy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Short Term Financial, L.L.C dba Americash Loans

2400 E. Devon Ave, Suite 300

Des Plaines, IL 60018

Defendant

DRAEGER, MISHELL

Fort Atkinson, WI 53538

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Schaefer, Emma Nicole

Schaefer, Emma N.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 240671, Payable Number: 187146, Receipt Number: 21R 021321, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: JEFFERSON; Case number: 2021SC000769; Caption: Short Term Financial, L.L.C dba Americash Loans vs. MISHELL DRAEGER; Total Amount: $2800.23; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Short Term Financial, L.L.C dba Americash Loans; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2400 E. Devon Ave, Suite 300, Des Plaines, IL 60018 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: MISHELL DRAEGER; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 900 SHERMAN AVE W, Fort Atkinson, WI 53538; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $170.55; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $2360.18; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of no answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Hamre Incha, Cindy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer; Court Reporter: Unmonitored DAR; Additional Text: [MK] Attorney Robert Nailen in court for Plaintiff Short Term Financial, L.L.C dba Americash Loans. Defendant Mishel Draeger does not appear. On Motion of Attorney Nailen, the Court grants Default Judgment in favor of the Plaintiff including costs and attorney fees--conditioned on the filing of an Affidavit of No Answer within thirty days. If this affidavit is not timely filed, this case will be dismissed without further notice or hearing. Review scheduled for December 10, 2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of publication; Amount: $64.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Publication summons; Additional Text: for 11/10/21 Return Date

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Amended summons and complaint; Additional Text: for 10/13/21 Return Date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for DRAEGER, MISHELL; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for MISHELL DRAEGER Current: N7309 County Rd N, Johnson Creek, WI 53038 (Effective: 09-16-2021) Prior: 900 SHERMAN AVE W, Fort Atkinson, WI 53538 US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of non-service; Amount: $53.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Amount: $2360.18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 174238, Payable Number: 184749, Receipt Number: 21R 015906, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Loan Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Loan Transaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Schaefer, Emma N.