This case was last updated from Sheboygan County Courts on 02/09/2022 at 05:28:01 (UTC).

Sheboygan County vs. Dustin Tveten

Case Summary

On 11/02/2021 Sheboygan County filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Dustin Tveten. This case was filed in Sheboygan County Courts, Sheboygan County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Schaubel, Susan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1556

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sheboygan, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Schaubel, Susan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sheboygan County

525 North Sixth Street

Sheboygan, WI 53081

Defendant

Tveten, Dustin

Sheboygan Falls, WI 53085

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bauer, Oliver M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 014741, Payable Number: 359574, Receipt Number: 21R 022474, Amount: $5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: SHEBOYGAN; Case number: 2021SC001556; Caption: Sheboygan County vs. Dustin Tveten; Total Amount: $708.75; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Dustin Tveten; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: W2276 North Street, Sheboygan Falls, WI 53085 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Sheboygan County; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 525 North Sixth Street, Sheboygan, WI 53081 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $562.25; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $50.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan; Additional Text: 08:35 AM Money judgment for plaintiff by default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Responsible court official changed; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan; Additional Text: $562.25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from Court to ALL litigants

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $96.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 013697, Payable Number: 358760, Receipt Number: 21R 020806, Amount: $96.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letter of appearance by attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bauer, Oliver M