This case was last updated from Racine County Courts on 02/09/2022 at 02:38:33 (UTC).

SCIL, Inc. d/b/a Speedy Cash vs. Lashunda Poole

Case Summary

On 10/29/2021 SCIL, Inc d/b/a Speedy Cash filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Lashunda Poole. This case was filed in Racine County Courts, Racine County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Rudebusch, Alice A, Gasiorkiewicz, Eugene A and Christensen, Samuel A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2996

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Racine, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Rudebusch, Alice A

Gasiorkiewicz, Eugene A

Christensen, Samuel A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCIL, INC. D/B/A SPEEDY CASH

C/O Markoff Law Llc, 29 N. Wacker Dr. #1010

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant

POOLE, LASHUNDA

Racine, WI 53405

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

McMahon, Dustin Allen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation/order of dismissal; Court Official: Rudebusch, Alice A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Stipulated dismissal; Court Official: Rudebusch, Alice A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation/prop. order of dismissal; Court Official: Rudebusch, Alice A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Adjourned return date on January 6, 2022 at 02:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Christensen, Samuel A; Additional Text: Pltf. by atty. and no app. by deft(s). Zoom appearance. Adjourned for further.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on November 18, 2021 at 08:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Complaint - Smalls Claims; Amount: $859.93

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 787498, Payable Number: 443321, Receipt Number: 21R 010659F, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Note

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less