This case was last updated from Racine County Courts on 02/09/2022 at 01:28:59 (UTC).

SCIL, INC. D/B/A SPEEDY CASH vs. ELVIRA ORTEGA

Case Summary

On 10/28/2021 SCIL, INC D/B/A SPEEDY CASH filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against ELVIRA ORTEGA. This case was filed in Racine County Courts, Racine County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Christensen, Samuel A and Fredrickson, Jon E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2970

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Racine, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Christensen, Samuel A

Fredrickson, Jon E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCIL, INC. D/B/A SPEEDY CASH

C/O Markoff Law Llc, 29 N. Wacker Dr. #1010

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant

ORTEGA, ELVIRA

Racine, WI 53403

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

McMahon, Dustin Allen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Christensen, Samuel A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Christensen, Samuel A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Fredrickson, Jon E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Judgment docketed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 000545, Payable Number: 447633, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: RACINE; Case number: 2021SC002970; Caption: SCIL, INC. D/B/A SPEEDY CASH vs. ELVIRA ORTEGA; Total Amount: $920.9; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: SCIL, INC. D/B/A SPEEDY CASH; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: c/o Markoff Law LLC, 29 N. Wacker Dr. #1010, Chicago, IL 60606 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: ELVIRA ORTEGA; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 842 MAIN ST APT 5, Racine, WI 53403 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Electronic Filing Fee; Amount: $20.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $622.71; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $70.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Other; Amount: $63.69; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $50.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Adjourned return date; Court Official: Christensen, Samuel A; Additional Text: Plaintiff SCIL, INC. D/B/A SPEEDY CASH not in court, Attorney Dustin Allen McMahon appeared by phone for SCIL, INC. D/B/A SPEEDY CASH, Defendant ELVIRA ORTEGA not in court. Judgment plus CC granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Adjourned return date on January 6, 2022 at 02:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Publication summons; Additional Text: 1/6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Attempted service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Christensen, Samuel A; Additional Text: Pltf. by atty. and no app. by deft(s). Zoom appearance. Adjourned for service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on November 18, 2021 at 08:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Complaint - Smalls Claims

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 709809, Payable Number: 443145, Receipt Number: 21R 010590F, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Installment Loan Note

    Read MoreRead Less