This case was last updated from Marathon County Courts on 02/09/2022 at 10:09:50 (UTC).

Schultz Property Management vs. Suzanne Michalski et al

Case Summary

On 11/12/2021 Schultz Property Management filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Suzanne Michalski. This case was filed in Marathon County Courts, Marathon County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Huber, Gregory, Jacobson, LaMont K and Ley, Amanda J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1857

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Marathon, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Huber, Gregory

Jacobson, LaMont K

Ley, Amanda J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Schultz Property Management

1129 Main St

Stevens Point, WI 54481

Defendants

Michalski, Suzanne

Weston, WI 54476

Pardo, Michael

Weston, WI 54476

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: Eviction hearing; Court Official: Jacobson, LaMont K.; Court Reporter: Leute, Miriam; Additional Text: Clerk Marisa. Case Called: 10:13 am Plaintiff does NOT appear. Deft, Suzanne Michalski, appears by Zoom audio, pro se. COURT notes history of matter and makes findings. COURT dismisses action based upon failure to prosecute. Adj: 10:13 am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Jacobson, LaMont K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: Ley, Amanda J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Eviction Hearing on January 31, 2022 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: Eviction on Jan. 25 @ 10:00 (TUESDAY) was rescheduled to Jan 31st @ 10 am in Branch 3.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Eviction Hearing on January 25, 2022 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Eviction Hearing on December 10, 2021 at 10:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Ley, Amanda J.; Additional Text: Case called 9:00 time block in Courtroom A. Clerk: Becca Schultz Property Mgt appears. Suzanne Michalski appears by zoom. Michael Pardo appears. Case contested. EVH and DHE set.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Eviction Hearing on December 13, 2021 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Damage hearing on January 25, 2022 at 01:30 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: Affidavit Regarding Defendant's Military Status for: Michael Pardo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Photo 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Current Lease

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Photo 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Photo 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Messages to Suzanne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: 5 Day Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Photo 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: 5 Day Notice to Remedy Default or Vacate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: 5 Day Notice to Remedy Default or Vacate

    Read MoreRead Less