This case was last updated from Dodge County Courts on 02/03/2022 at 17:18:10 (UTC).

Schaefer's Soft Water, Inc. vs. Stacy Sanders

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 Schaefer's Soft Water, Inc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Stacy Sanders. This case was filed in Dodge County Courts, Dodge County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Seim, Steven and Pfitzinger, Brian A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0466

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Dodge, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Seim, Steven

Pfitzinger, Brian A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Schaefer's Soft Water, Inc.

824 N. Church Street

Watertown, WI 53098

Defendant

Sanders, Stacy

Watertown, WI 54894

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eggert, Lauren Marie

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: Stacy Sanders, NEJ/FDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 061574, Payable Number: 231737, Receipt Number: 21R 011327, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: DODGE; Case number: 2021SC000466; Caption: Schaefer's Soft Water, Inc. vs. Stacy Sanders; Total Amount: $1816.47; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Stacy Sanders; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: N5450 E Wilson Lake Road, Watertown, WI 54894; Judgment Party; Party Name: Schaefer's Soft Water, Inc.; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 824 N. Church Street, Watertown, WI 53098 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1429.86; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $122.11; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of non-service; Additional Text: $75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of non-service; Additional Text: no cost listed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication; Additional Text: $47.11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Seim, Steven; Court Reporter: Recording System; Additional Text: Attorney Lauren Marie Eggert in court for Plaintiff Schaefer's Soft Water, Inc.. Defendant Stacy Sanders not in court. Default judgment granted for amount requested plus applicable court costs.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Seim, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Seim, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Seim, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing; Additional Text: Affidavit of Mailing Summons and Complaint & Publication Summons and Complaint to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Publication summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Amended summons and complaint; Court Official: Pfitzinger, Brian A.; Additional Text: $1429.86

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Sanders, Stacy; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Stacy Sanders Current: N5450 E Wilson Lake Road, Watertown, WI 54894 (Effective: 05-04-2021) Prior: 408 Chadwick Court, Watertown, WI 53094 US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Court Official: Seim, Steven; Additional Text: $1429.86

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 040028, Payable Number: 228745, Receipt Number: 21R 006982, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eggert, Lauren Marie