This case was last updated from Barron County Courts on 02/06/2022 at 16:16:49 (UTC).

S.C Swiderski, LLC vs. Tiffany J Zehm et al

Case Summary

On 08/05/2021 S C Swiderski, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Tiffany J Zehm. This case was filed in Barron County Courts, Barron County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Bitney, J. M, Amy Pavick and Millermon, Sharon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0469

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Barron, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Bitney, J. M

Amy Pavick

Millermon, Sharon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

S.C Swiderski, LLC

401 Ranger Street

Mosinee, WI 54455

Defendants

Zehm, Tiffany J

Spooner, WI 54801

Parker, Phillip W

Spooner, WI 54801

Garnishee

CT Trucking

Bloomer, WI 54724

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: case e-forwarded to Judge and JA with request for instruction as to judgment against garnishee defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Hearing; Court Official: Bitney, J. M.; Court Reporter: Schaaf, Karen; Additional Text: 08:32 AM Defendant Tiffany J Zehm not in court. Plaintiff S.C Swiderski, LLC not in court. Defendant Phillip W Parker not in court. Garnishee CT Trucking not in court. Court notes plaintiff filed a motion for judgment. Court relates of case history. Proof of service has been filed for the garnishment. Court grants plaintiff's request. Plaintiff shall prepare an order and submit for signature within 10 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of motion, motion; Additional Text: for Judgment Against Garnishee - Earnings Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 075383, Payable Number: 123572, Receipt Number: 21RP002336, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 075383, Payable Number: 123572, Receipt Number: 21RP002336, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 075315, Payable Number: 123556, Receipt Number: 21RP002315, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Millermon, Sharon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: BARRON; Case number: 2021SC000469; Caption: S.C Swiderski, LLC vs. Tiffany J Zehm et al; Total Amount: $4039.26; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Tiffany J Zehm; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 101 W Hazel St, Spooner, WI 54801 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Phillip W Parker; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 101 W Hazel St, Spooner, WI 54801 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: S.C Swiderski, LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 401 Ranger Street, Mosinee, WI 54455 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $3844.76; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $75.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Adjourned return date; Court Official: Bitney, J. M.; Court Reporter: Schaaf, Karen; Additional Text: 01:44 PM Defendant Tiffany J Zehm not in court. Defendant Phillip W Parker not in court. Plaintiff S.C Swiderski, LLC not in court.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Bitney, J. M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Bitney, J. M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Additional Text: 09/10/2021 service of amended summons and complaint on Tiffany Joy Parker and Phillip W Parker

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketEvent: Amended summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Additional Text: to plaintiff with attachments to serve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Additional Text: Notice to Plaintiff with attachments to serve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 058804, Payable Number: 122578, Receipt Number: 21RP001842, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less