This case was last updated from Rock County Courts on 01/25/2022 at 12:42:55 (UTC).

Samantha Wileman et al vs. American Family Mutual Insurance Company S.I. et al

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 Samantha Wileman filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against American Family Mutual Insurance Company S I. This case was filed in Rock County Courts, Rock County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Kuglitsch, Jeffrey S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0795

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Rock, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Kuglitsch, Jeffrey S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wileman, Samantha

Edgerton, WI 53534

Defendants

American Family Mutual Insurance Company S.I.

6000 American Parkway

Madison, WI 53783

Teske, Linda A

Cambridge, WI 53523

Not Yet Classified

Dean Health Plan Inc

1277 Deming Way

Madison, WI 53717

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

One State Farm Plaza

Bloomington, IL 61710

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Caya, Steven T.

Dykstra, Emily A.

Defendant Attorney

Isaacson, Chester Anthony

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Conlin, Shannon Ashley

Theesfeld, Phillip C

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 085600, Payable Number: 260610, Receipt Number: 22R 001384, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Attorney Phillip C Theesfeld retained by Involuntary Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Answer, cross-claim & counterclaim; Additional Text: by Involuntary Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, with Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Answer, affirmative defense and cross claim; Additional Text: by Defendants, with Answer to all Present and Future Claims and Cross-Claims

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 950394, Payable Number: 259506, Receipt Number: 21R 038274, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Defendants: Linda A Teske and American Family Mutual Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 950182, Payable Number: 259319, Receipt Number: 21R 037947, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Appearance; Additional Text: Attorney Shannon A Conlin retained by Involuntary Plaintiff Dean Health Plan Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Claim and cross claim; Additional Text: by Involuntary Plaintiff Dean Health Plan Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Document(s): Summons and Complaint with eFiling Notice was served to John Long, Clerk, authorized on behalf of Involuntary Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on December 6, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Document(s): Summons and Complaint with eFiling Notice was served to Defendant Linda A Teske on December 4, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Document(s): Summons and Complaint with eFiling Notice was served to John Long, Clerk, authorized on behalf of Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company S.I.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Document(s): Summons and Complaint with eFiling Notice was served to Steve Karis, Customer Service, authorized on behalf of Involuntary Plaintiff Dean Health Plan Inc on December 8, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 865074, Payable Number: 257956, Receipt Number: 21R 035914, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Isaacson, Chester Anthony