This case was last updated from Washington County Wisconsin Courts on 02/01/2022 at 13:11:42 (UTC).

Salander Enterprises, LLC vs. JOHN JAHR

Case Summary

On 02/08/2021 Salander Enterprises, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOHN JAHR. This case was filed in Washington County Wisconsin Courts, Washington County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Martens, Todd K and Russell, Theresa M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0164

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Washington, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Martens, Todd K

Russell, Theresa M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Salander Enterprises, LLC

225 S. Executive Dr

Brookfield, WI 53005

Defendant

JAHR, JOHN

Germantown, WI 53022

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mackelly, Meghan Patricia

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 039929, Payable Number: 154540, Receipt Number: 21R 006621, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Russell, Theresa M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Martens, Todd K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: WASHINGTON; Case number: 2021SC000164; Caption: Salander Enterprises, LLC vs. JOHN JAHR; Total Amount: $2423.99; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: JOHN JAHR; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: W132N12072 MARY BUTH LN, Germantown, WI 53022 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Salander Enterprises, LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 225 S. Executive Dr, Brookfield, WI 53005 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $2083.83; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $75.66; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Russell, Theresa M; Additional Text: No appearance by defendant; default judgment for plaintiff in the amount of $2,083.83, plus costs.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Russell, Theresa M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of publication; Amount: $39.66; Additional Text: of 3/22/2021 Return Date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Publication summons; Additional Text: for 03/22/2021 return date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing; Additional Text: 03/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of non-service; Amount: $36.0; Additional Text: of Summons & Complaint on John Jahr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Amended summons and complaint; Amount: $2083.83

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Amount: $1919.33; Additional Text: Return Date: 3/08/21 at 9:00 a.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 019573, Payable Number: 153007, Receipt Number: 21R 002491, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mackelly, Meghan Patricia