This case was last updated from La Crosse County Courts on 01/31/2022 at 21:25:12 (UTC).

Salander Enterprises, LLC vs. JOEY VIGIL

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 Salander Enterprises, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOEY VIGIL. This case was filed in La Crosse County Courts, La Crosse County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Levine, Elliott M, Wickler, Jody R and Gonzalez, Ramona A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0089

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    La Crosse, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Levine, Elliott M

Wickler, Jody R

Gonzalez, Ramona A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Salander Enterprises, LLC

225 S. Executive Dr

Brookfield, WI 53005

Defendant

VIGIL, JOEY

La Crosse, WI 54603

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Duppler, Cynthia A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 005303, Payable Number: 184224, Receipt Number: 21R 008919, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: LA CROSSE; Case number: 2021SC000089; Caption: Salander Enterprises, LLC vs. JOEY VIGIL; Total Amount: $3282.56; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: JOEY VIGIL; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1402 Liberty St, La Crosse, WI 54603; Judgment Party; Party Name: Salander Enterprises, LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 225 S. Executive Dr, Brookfield, WI 53005 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $2885.8; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $125.26; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $116.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Gonzalez, Ramona A.; Additional Text: NO APPEARANCE BY DEF, DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Gonzalez, Ramona A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Gonzalez, Ramona A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Gonzalez, Ramona A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication; Additional Text: $67.26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of non-service; Amount: $58.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Publication summons

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 001453, Payable Number: 181181, Receipt Number: 21R 002346, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: LA CROSSE; Case number: 2021SC000089; Caption: Salander Enterprises, LLC vs. JOEY VIGIL; Total Amount: $3157.3; Satisfaction: Other; Judgment Party; Party Name: JOEY VIGIL; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1402 Liberty St, La Crosse, WI 54603; Judgment Party; Party Name: Salander Enterprises, LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 225 S. Executive Dr, Brookfield, WI 53005 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $2885.8; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $116.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0; Civil Judgement Events; Date: 2021-04-23; Type: Vacate judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Levine, Elliott M; Additional Text: 11:19 AM No answer filed, judgment granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Levine, Elliott M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Levine, Elliott M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Levine, Elliott M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 000362, Payable Number: 180290, Receipt Number: 21R 000658, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Duppler, Cynthia A