This case was last updated from Racine County Courts on 02/08/2022 at 22:01:42 (UTC).

RPF Durand LLC d/b/a Central Park Apartments vs. Patrick Johns

Case Summary

On 10/22/2021 RPF Durand LLC d/b/a Central Park Apartments filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Patrick Johns. This case was filed in Racine County Courts, Racine County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Gasiorkiewicz, Eugene A, Christensen, Samuel A and Fredrickson, Jon E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2930

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Racine, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Gasiorkiewicz, Eugene A

Christensen, Samuel A

Fredrickson, Jon E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RPF Durand LLC D/B/A Central Park Apartments

1387 30Th Ave.

Kenosha, WI 53144

Defendant

Johns, Patrick

Fennimore, WI 53809

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fagerland Pezewski, Kirsten

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Damage hearing; Court Official: Christensen, Samuel A; Additional Text: Plaintiff RPF Durand LLC d/b/a Central Park Apartments appeared by video, Attorney Kirsten Fagerland Pezewski appeared by video for RPF Durand LLC d/b/a Central Park Apartments, Defendant Patrick Johns not in court. Money portion dismissed by attorney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Damage hearing on December 16, 2021 at 08:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Writ of restitution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for eviction; County: RACINE; Case number: 2021SC002930; Caption: RPF Durand LLC d/b/a Central Park Apartments vs. Patrick Johns; Judgment Party; Party Name: Patrick Johns; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1518 2nd St, Fennimore, WI 53809; Judgment Party; Party Name: RPF Durand LLC d/b/a Central Park Apartments; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1387 30th Ave., Kenosha, WI 53144 US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Fredrickson, Jon E.; Court Reporter: Miller, Hannah; Additional Text: 10:40 AM Court Reporter: Hannah Miller. Attorney Kirsten Fagerland Pezewski appeared by zoom/video means for Plaintiff RPF Durand LLC d/b/a Central Park Apartments. Defendant Patrick Johns did not appear by zoom/video means. Statement by Atty Pezewski - Request Writ of Restitution. Damage hearing requested. New address given to the Court for Def. BTC: Writ of Restitution - Granted. Damage hearing set.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing; Court Official: Fredrickson, Jon E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Johns, Patrick; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Patrick Johns Current: 1518 2nd St, Fennimore, WI 53809 United States (Effective: 11-16-2021) Prior: 4215 Durand Ave. 8, Racine, WI 53405 US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Fredrickson, Jon E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for writ; Court Official: Fredrickson, Jon E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 788655, Payable Number: 444324, Receipt Number: 21R 011241F, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of posting; Additional Text: and mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on November 16, 2021 at 10:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Complaint - Smalls Claims

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 709336, Payable Number: 442761, Receipt Number: 21R 010376F, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: Patrick Johns

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Additional Text: 5 Day Eviction notice

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fagerland Pezewski, Kirsten