This case was last updated from Marathon County Courts on 02/05/2022 at 12:59:18 (UTC).

Royal-WL LLC vs. Josiah M Johnson et al

Case Summary

On 06/16/2021 Royal-WL LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Josiah M Johnson. This case was filed in Marathon County Courts, Marathon County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Moran, Michael K, Marcus, Sandra J, Ley, Amanda J and Bauman, Douglas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0978

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Marathon, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Moran, Michael K

Marcus, Sandra J

Ley, Amanda J

Bauman, Douglas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Royal-WL LLC

232867 Sunnyvale Lane, C/O Paul Schraufnagel

Wausau, WI 54401

Royal Heating and Cooling

Wausau, WI 54401

Defendants

Johnson, Josiah M

Aniwa, WI 54408

Johnson Brothers Construction

E19350 Plum Lane

Aniwa, WI 54408

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Ruffi, Sarah L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulated dismissal; Court Official: Ley, Amanda J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Court trial; Court Official: Ley, Amanda J.; Additional Text: No parties appear. Stipulated Order for Dismissal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation/order of dismissal; Court Official: Ley, Amanda J.; Additional Text: signed on 11-30-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Court trial on November 30, 2021 at 01:30 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Court Official: Ley, Amanda J.; Additional Text: from Attorney Ruffi Requesting Adjournment of Damages Hearing - approved 10/25/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Court trial on November 9, 2021 at 01:30 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Bauman, Douglas; Additional Text: Case called 10:00 time block in Courtroom A. Clerk: Becca Royal WL LLC appears by zoom. Attorney Ruffi appears for Josiah Johnson and Johnson Bros Construction . Case contested. CT set.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return Date on September 15, 2021 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return Date on September 15, 2021 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Marcus, Sandra J.; Additional Text: on Motion to Reopen Small Claims Judgment signed on 08-16-21

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Notice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Marcus, Sandra J.; Additional Text: Case called 10:00 time block in Sara Quirt-Sann Memorial Courtroom. Clerk: Gina. Royal-WI LLC does not appear. Attorney Ruffi appears by zoom for Josiah Johnson and Johnson Bros Construction Case dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Marcus, Sandra J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Marcus, Sandra J.; Additional Text: Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: Marcus, Sandra J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Marcus, Sandra J.; Additional Text: SECOND AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return Date on July 14, 2021 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $96.5; Additional Text: 21R 009926

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Receipt; Amount: $2.0; Additional Text: 21R 009926

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ruffi, Sarah L