This case was last updated from Sheboygan County Courts on 01/21/2022 at 15:18:00 (UTC).

Roswitha T Both vs. City Plan Commission of the City of Sheboygan

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 Roswitha T Both filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against City Plan Commission of the City of Sheboygan. This case was filed in Sheboygan County Courts, Sheboygan County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Persick, Rebecca L, Stengel, L Edward, Sutkiewicz, Angela W and Borowski, Daniel J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0015

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Sheboygan, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Persick, Rebecca L

Stengel, L Edward

Sutkiewicz, Angela W

Borowski, Daniel J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Both, Roswitha T

Pewaukee, WI 53072

Defendant

City Plan Commission of the City of Sheboygan

828 Center Avenue, Suite 208

Sheboygan, WI 53081

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Henry, Kathleen Green

Defendant Attorney

Adams, Charles Christopher

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Receipt; Amount: $1.25; Additional Text: 21R 003330

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Receipt; Amount: $3.0; Additional Text: 21R 003330

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Stengel, L Edward; Additional Text: (signed 02-16-2021) with prejudice and without costs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Settlement/Stipulation to Dismiss - Before Trial; Court Official: Stengel, L Edward

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order assigning judge/judicial assignment order; Court Official: Stengel, L Edward

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of assignment of judge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation; Additional Text: of dismissal by consent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Application for specific judicial assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Motion; Additional Text: of Plaintiff for Substitution of Judge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Application for specific judicial assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order assigning judge/judicial assignment order; Court Official: Borowski, Daniel J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of assignment of judge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order Declined

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: to Melissa Clevenger

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Court Official: Persick, Rebecca L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $184.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 000567, Payable Number: 349046, Receipt Number: 21R 000949, Amount: $184.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less