This case was last updated from Winnebago County Courts on 01/31/2022 at 21:23:01 (UTC).

Robert William Perron vs. Audiology and Hearing Services LLC

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 Robert William Perron filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Audiology and Hearing Services LLC. This case was filed in Winnebago County Courts, Winnebago County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Keberlein, Bryan D and Budiac, Maureen C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0095

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Winnebago, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Keberlein, Bryan D

Budiac, Maureen C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Perron, Robert William

Appleton, WI 54914

Defendant

Audiology and Hearing Services LLC

2245 S Oneida St

Appleton, WI 54915

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Thao, Shawn Xiong

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $22.0; Additional Text: 21R 001029

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Service; Amount: $2.0; Additional Text: 21R 001029

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Change of Venue - case originated in Outagamie County. requesting change of venue to Winnebago County filed by Plaintiff Received event LETC from Outagamie County for case #2020SC002875 Document(s) associated with source event: Letters/correspondence requesting change of venue to Winnebago County filed by Plaintiff.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for change of venue; Additional Text: Change of Venue - case originated in Outagamie County. to Winnebago County Received event POCV from Outagamie County for case #2020SC002875 Document(s) associated with source event: Prop. Order for change of venue to Winnebago County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Budiac, Maureen C.; Additional Text: Change of Venue - case originated in Outagamie County. to Winnebago County Event type was converted from OCV to OR. Received event OR from Outagamie County for case #2020SC002875 Document(s) associated with source event: Order for change of venue to Winnebago County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of transmittal; Additional Text: Change of Venue - case originated in Outagamie County. Received event COTE from Outagamie County for case #2020SC002875 Document(s) associated with source event: Certificate of Transmittal. Case file received from Outagamie County for case #2020SC002875 containing records dating from 12-15-2020 through 01-13-2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Change of Venue - case originated in Outagamie County. Adjourned return date on February 8, 2021 at 02:30 pm. Received event NOH from Outagamie County for case #2020SC002875 Document(s) associated with source event: Notice of Hearing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Budiac, Maureen C.; Additional Text: Change of Venue - case originated in Outagamie County. Plaintiff appeared by phone; Atty Shawn Thao appeared by phone for defendant. Court determines wrong venue. Received event RD from Outagamie County for case #2020SC002875 Document(s) associated with source event: Return date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update; Additional Text: Change of Venue - case originated in Outagamie County. Received event ENU from Outagamie County for case #2020SC002875 Document(s) associated with source event: Electronic Notice Status Change.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Additional Text: Change of Venue - case originated in Outagamie County. of S&C as to defendant on 12-22-20; $75 Received event COS from Outagamie County for case #2020SC002875 Document(s) associated with source event: Certificate of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice; Additional Text: Change of Venue - case originated in Outagamie County. Received event EFN from Outagamie County for case #2020SC002875 Document(s) associated with source event: Electronic Filing Notice, Electronic Filing Notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Change of Venue - case originated in Outagamie County. Adjustment Number: 21A 976763, Payable Number: 390604, Receipt Number: 20R 235620, Amount: $20.00 Received event EDFP from Outagamie County for case #2020SC002875

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Appearance; Additional Text: Change of Venue - case originated in Outagamie County. Atty Shawn Thao for defendants Received event NA from Outagamie County for case #2020SC002875 Document(s) associated with source event: Notice of appearance - Atty Shawn Thao for defendants.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketEvent: Answer and counterclaim; Additional Text: Change of Venue - case originated in Outagamie County. filed by Atty Shawn Thao on behalf of defendants Received event AAC from Outagamie County for case #2020SC002875 Document(s) associated with source event: Answer and Counter-claim filed by Atty Shawn Thao on behalf of defendants.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Change of Venue - case originated in Outagamie County. Defendant's proposed exhibit - Purchase Agreement Received event OP from Outagamie County for case #2020SC002875 Document(s) associated with source event: Defendant's proposed exhibit - Purchase Agreement.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by private process; Additional Text: Change of Venue - case originated in Outagamie County. MONEY $5000.00 Received event SCSPP from Outagamie County for case #2020SC002875 Document(s) associated with source event: Summons and complaint-service by private process.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Additional Text: Change of Venue - case originated in Outagamie County. to parties regarding their appearances at Return Date Received event NOT from Outagamie County for case #2020SC002875 Document(s) associated with source event: Notice to parties regarding their appearances at Return Date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically; Additional Text: Change of Venue - case originated in Outagamie County. Received event FRE from Outagamie County for case #2020SC002875

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Change of Venue - case originated in Outagamie County. Return date on January 11, 2021 at 02:30 pm. Received event NOH from Outagamie County for case #2020SC002875 Document(s) associated with source event: Notice of Hearing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $94.5; Additional Text: Change of Venue - case originated in Outagamie County. 20R 234738 Received event FFP from Outagamie County for case #2020SC002875

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thao, Shawn Xiong