This case was last updated from Kenosha County Courts on 01/23/2022 at 10:38:37 (UTC).

Renee Mohr et al vs. Gateway Properties of Kenosha, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 Renee Mohr filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Gateway Properties of Kenosha, LLC. This case was filed in Kenosha County Courts, Kenosha County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Kerkman, Chad G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0481

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Kenosha, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Kerkman, Chad G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mohr, Renee

Kenosha, WI 53143

Defendants

Gateway Properties of Kenosha, LLC

C/O David Lynn Thornton, 5223 26Th Avenue

Kenosha, WI 53140

XYZ Insurance Company

A Fictitious Insurance Company

Kenosha, WI 53140

Country Mutual Insurance Company

A Fictitious Insurance Company

Kenosha, WI 53140

Not Yet Classified

State of Wisconsin-Department of Health Services

C/O Office Of Legal Counsel, 1 W. Wilson St., Room 651

Madison, WI 53707

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Houck, Thomas Kent

Defendant Attorneys

Hills, Rick E.

Sucevic, Thomas C

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Rakvic-Farr, Laure

Kuettel, Vanessa A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2022
  • HearingDescription: Jury trial; Court Official: Kerkman, Chad G; Location: Branch 8, Courtroom 305; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • HearingDescription: Final pre-trial; Court Official: Kerkman, Chad G; Location: Branch 8, Courtroom 305; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Witness list - plaintiff; Additional Text: PL, Renee Mohr's Witness List and Itemization of Special Damages - filed by Atty Thomas Houck

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Jury demand; Court Official: Kerkman, Chad G; Additional Text: DE's Jury Demand - filed by Atty Rick Hills

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Jury fee paid; Amount: $72.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 561532, Payable Number: 331367, Receipt Number: 21R 030029, Amount: $72.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Scheduling conference; Court Official: Kerkman, Chad G; Court Reporter: Chentnik, Amanda; Additional Text: 09:36 AM Attorney Thomas Kent Houck in court for Plaintiff Renee Mohr. Attorney Rick E. Hills in court for Defendant Country Mutual Insurance Company and Defendant Gateway Properties of Kenosha, LLC. Clerk: HN. Scheduling conference held. 12 person Jury Trial requested, jury fee to be paid within 30 days. Length of trial, 3 days. Any claim for permanency including designation of lay and expert witnesses to be filed by 1/7/22 for the PL. Any IME including designation of lay and expert witnesses to be filed by 4/8/22 for the DE. Any dispositive motions are to be filed by 4/8/22. All other deadlines as set forth in the scheduling order. Final pre-trial scheduled for September 7, 2022 at 10:00 am. Jury trial scheduled for September 19, 2022 at 08:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Scheduling order; Court Official: Kerkman, Chad G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation; Court Official: Kerkman, Chad G; Additional Text: Stipulation and Proposed Order to substitute party name - filed by Atty Thomas Houck

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Court Official: Kerkman, Chad G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Kerkman, Chad G; Additional Text: Order Substituting party name

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: filed by Atty Laure Rakvic-Farr on behalf of WI dept. of HS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer and affirmative defense; Additional Text: DE's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint and Answer to Any Claim by Involuntary Plaintiff - filed by Atty Rick Hills

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 334748, Payable Number: 324312, Receipt Number: 21R 018377, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: filed by Atty Rick Hills on behalf of DE's

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Kerkman, Chad G; Additional Text: Conference Order & Notice of Scheduling Conference.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 279327, Payable Number: 323016, Receipt Number: 21R 016150, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sucevic, Thomas C

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hills, Rick E.