This case was last updated from Sauk County Courts on 02/03/2022 at 02:01:40 (UTC).

Reedsburg Area Medical Center vs. SHAWN M HANSEN et al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 Reedsburg Area Medical Center filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against SHAWN M HANSEN. This case was filed in Sauk County Courts, Sauk County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Grill, Leo and O'Rourke, Debra V. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0382

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sauk, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Grill, Leo

O'Rourke, Debra V

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Reedsburg Area Medical Center

2000 N. Dewey Ave.

Reedsburg, WI 53959

Defendants

HANSEN, SHAWN M

Reedsburg, WI 53959

HANSEN, PERRY L

Reedsburg, WI 53959

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Salna, Vytas P.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: O'Rourke, Debra V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: O'Rourke, Debra V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: SAUK; Case number: 2021SC000382; Caption: Reedsburg Area Medical Center vs. SHAWN M HANSEN et al; Total Amount: $514.79; Judgment Party; Party Name: SHAWN M HANSEN; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 814 K STREET, Reedsburg, WI 53959 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: PERRY L HANSEN; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 814 K STREET, Reedsburg, WI 53959 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Reedsburg Area Medical Center; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2000 N. Dewey Ave., Reedsburg, WI 53959 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $180.84; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $169.45; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $50.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Other; Amount: $20.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: O'Rourke, Debra V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: O'Rourke, Debra V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of publication; Additional Text: Publication fee $49.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Publication summons; Additional Text: Publication Summons and Notice (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Clerk Instruction Letter; adjournment request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Responsible court official changed; Court Official: O'Rourke, Debra V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Clerk Instruction Letter; adjournment request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Publication summons; Additional Text: Publication Summons and Notice (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of non-service; Additional Text: on Shawn Marie Hansen; $60.00 SF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of non-service; Additional Text: on Perry Lee Hansen; $60.00 SF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Complaint - Smalls Claims; Additional Text: Money demand for $180.84

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 002915, Payable Number: 238015, Receipt Number: 21R 005986, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Salna, Vytas P.