This case was last updated from Sauk County Courts on 02/08/2022 at 18:59:15 (UTC).

Reedsburg Area Medical Center vs. MICHAEL D DAVISON et al

Case Summary

On 10/18/2021 Reedsburg Area Medical Center filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against MICHAEL D DAVISON. This case was filed in Sauk County Courts, Sauk County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is O'Rourke, Debra V. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1193

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sauk, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

O'Rourke, Debra V

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Reedsburg Area Medical Center

2000 N. Dewey Ave.

Reedsburg, WI 53959

Defendants

DAVISON, MICHAEL D

La Farge, WI 54639

DAVISON, DINAH R

La Farge, WI 54639

Garnishee

Heartland Express Inc.

901 Heartland Way, Attn: Payroll

North Liberty, IA 52317

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Salna, Vytas P.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 000596, Payable Number: 246733, Receipt Number: 22R 000944, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 000596, Payable Number: 246733, Receipt Number: 22R 000944, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: O'Rourke, Debra V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: O'Rourke, Debra V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: SAUK; Case number: 2021SC001193; Caption: Reedsburg Area Medical Center vs. MICHAEL D DAVISON et al; Total Amount: $1125.79; Judgment Party; Party Name: MICHAEL D DAVISON; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 113 N BIRD ST, La Farge, WI 54639 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: DINAH R DAVISON; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 113 N BIRD ST, La Farge, WI 54639 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Reedsburg Area Medical Center; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2000 N. Dewey Ave., Reedsburg, WI 53959 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $871.29; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $90.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $50.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Other; Amount: $20.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: O'Rourke, Debra V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: O'Rourke, Debra V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer; Additional Text: of Dinah and Michael Davison; admitting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: on Dinah R. Davison; $60.00 SF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: on Michael D. Davison; $30.00 SF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Complaint - Smalls Claims; Additional Text: Money demand for $871.29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 011220, Payable Number: 244334, Receipt Number: 21R 019899, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Salna, Vytas P.