This case was last updated from La Crosse County Courts on 02/09/2022 at 07:45:08 (UTC).

Redwood Terrace Apartments, LLC vs. Stephanie Stenberg

Case Summary

On 11/08/2021 Redwood Terrace Apartments, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Stephanie Stenberg. This case was filed in La Crosse County Courts, La Crosse County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Levine, Elliott M, Wickler, Jody R and Rauls, Abigail K. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1580

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    La Crosse, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Levine, Elliott M

Wickler, Jody R

Rauls, Abigail K

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Redwood Terrace Apartments, LLC

812 Redwood Street

Onalaska, WI 54650

Defendant

Stenberg, Stephanie

Holmen, WI 54636

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pierce, David, Jr.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Mediation hearing; Court Official: Rauls, Abigail K; Additional Text: set for trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Stenberg, Stephanie; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Stephanie Stenberg Current: PO Box 362, Holmen, WI 54636 United States (Effective: 12-29-2021) Prior: 903 10th Avenue North, Unit 17, Onalaska, WI 54650 US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Mediation hearing on January 18, 2022 at 03:30 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from mediator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summary Judgment Hearing; Court Official: Levine, Elliott M; Court Reporter: Bjerke, Tina; Additional Text: COURT: EVICTION GRANTED AS REQUESTED, TENANT MUST BE OUT BY MONDAY 12/1/21 BY NOON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation; Additional Text: Stipulation--Signed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Summary Judgment Hearing on December 8, 2021 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Mediation agreement; Court Official: Rauls, Abigail K; Additional Text: Settled for eviction portion, adjourning for new mediation on damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: mediator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Atty Pierce re: request for judgment for eviction without mediation and request to schedule the competing money judgment claims for mediation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer and counterclaim; Additional Text: $10,000 COUNTERCLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Mediation hearing on November 24, 2021 at 09:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Amount: $100.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 009683, Payable Number: 187881, Receipt Number: 21R 015624, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pierce, David, Jr.