This case was last updated from Sheboygan County Courts on 02/07/2022 at 15:22:15 (UTC).

Randall T Klinzing vs. Jessica McKinster

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 Randall T Klinzing filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Jessica McKinster. This case was filed in Sheboygan County Courts, Sheboygan County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Schaubel, Susan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1264

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sheboygan, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Schaubel, Susan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Klinzing, Randall T

Sheboygan, WI 53081

Defendant

McKinster, Jessica

Sheboygan, WI 53081

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Pre-trial conference; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan; Additional Text: No appearance by either party Case dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: re: NOH as to Jessica

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Pre-trial conference on November 17, 2021 at 09:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Writ of restitution fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: 21R 019024

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Writ of restitution; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for eviction; County: SHEBOYGAN; Case number: 2021SC001264; Caption: Randall T Klinzing vs. Jessica McKinster; Property/Remarks: Eviction of Jessica McKinster from 2205 N 11th St Sheboygan, WI 53081; Judgment Party; Party Name: Randall T Klinzing; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2219 Indiana Ave, Sheboygan, WI 53081; Judgment Party; Party Name: Jessica McKinster; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2205 North 11th Street, Sheboygan, WI 53081

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Eviction return date; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan; Additional Text: No answer filed by deft Judgment for pltf Eviction by writ Hold for damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: to Jessica no fee listed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketEvent: Responsible court official changed; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $94.5; Additional Text: 21R 016655

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: From Court to all litigants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less