This case was last updated from Rock County Courts on 02/05/2022 at 01:33:31 (UTC).

R K Smith Realty vs. Melisa Conner et al

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 R K Smith Realty filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Melisa Conner. This case was filed in Rock County Courts, Rock County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Meyer, Stephen D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1436

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Rock, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Meyer, Stephen D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

R K Smith Realty

Janesville, WI 53548

Defendants

Conner, Melisa

Janesville, WI 53545

Conner, Elbert

Janesville, WI 53545

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robinson, Mark Edward

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: Judgment/Notice of Entry of Judgment for Money with Order for Financial Disclosure- NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED, UNABLE TO FORWARD, RETURN TO SENDER (Defendant Melisa Conner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: Judgment/Notice of Entry of Judgment for Money with Order for Financial Disclosure- NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED, UNABLE TO FORWARD, RETURN TO SENDER (Defendant Elbert Conner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing returned; Additional Text: NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED, UNABLE TO FORWARD, RETURN TO SENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing returned; Additional Text: NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED, UNABLE TO FORWARD, RETURN TO SENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judgment docketed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Meyer, Stephen D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Meyer, Stephen D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 578742, Payable Number: 251281, Receipt Number: 21R 023722, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: ROCK; Case number: 2021SC001436; Caption: R K Smith Realty vs. Melisa Conner et al; Total Amount: $3032.47; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Melisa Conner; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 238 Milton Avenue, Janesville, WI 53545 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Elbert Conner; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 238 Milton Avenue, Janesville, WI 53545 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: R K Smith Realty; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 207 N. Academy St., Ste. 150, Janesville, WI 53548 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $2656.21; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $111.76; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Adjourned return date; Court Official: Meyer, Stephen D.; Additional Text: 09:34 AM Attorney Mark Edward Robinson appeared by phone means for Plaintiff R K Smith Realty. Defendant Elbert Conner not in court. Defendant Melisa Conner not in court. Judgment for Plaintiff, money: $2656.21 plus costs.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Attempted service; Additional Text: Attempted service of Summons and Complaint with eFiling Notice to Defendant(s): Elbert Conner on June 6, 2021, June 7, 2021 and June 13, 2021. Fees: $10.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Attempted service; Additional Text: Attempted service of Summons and Complaint with eFiling Notice, Security Deposit Statement Letter, Delinquent Account Letter, tenant ledger, Declaration of Cares Act and Declaration of nonmilitary service to Defendant(s): Melisa Conner on June 6, 2021, June 7, 2021 and June 13, 2021. Fees: $45.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on June 30, 2021 at 09:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Additional Text: Pending service. Claim for money $2,656.21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 494040, Payable Number: 248591, Receipt Number: 21R 018630, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: Defendant: Elbert Conner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: Defendant: Melisa Conner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Plaintiff's Declaration of CARES Act: Eviction Melisa Conner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Plaintiff's Declaration of CARES Act: Eviction Elbert Conner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robinson, Mark Edward