This case was last updated from Eau Claire County Courts on 01/22/2022 at 15:51:13 (UTC).

Rocket Mortgage, LLC vs. Joseph J Wright et al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 Rocket Mortgage, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Joseph J Wright. This case was filed in Eau Claire County Courts, Eau Claire County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Manydeeds, John F. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0139

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Eau Claire, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Manydeeds, John F

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Quicken Loans, LLC

635 Woodward Avenue

Detroit, MI 48226

Rocket Mortgage, LLC

635 Woodward Avenue

Detroit, MI 48226

Defendants

Wright, Joseph J

Eau Claire, WI 54703

Unknown Spouse of Joseph J. Wright

Eau Claire, WI 54703

Eau Claire County Clerk of Circuit Court

C/O Corporation Counsel, 721 Oxford Avenue Ste 3520

Eau Claire, WI 54703

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cummings, Shannon Kathleen

Defendant Attorney

Ellefsen, Charles R., III

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Additional Text: by mailing the Notice of Sheriff's Sale to Joseph Wright and Charles Ellefsen III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Statement of Indebtedness

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Party dismissed for Unknown Spouse of Joseph J. Wright; Court Official: Manydeeds, John F.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Manydeeds, John F.; Additional Text: Order Dismissing Defendant Unknown Spouse of Joseph J. Wright from case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Manydeeds, John F.; Additional Text: Amending Name of Plaintiff (to Rocket Mortgage, LLC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Findings of facts/conclusions of law w/ judgment; Court Official: Manydeeds, John F.; Additional Text: total due of $141,279.10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Manydeeds, John F.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: **Invalid document**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Motion; Additional Text: to Dismiss Defendant Unknown Spouse of Joseph J. Wright from Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: Order Dismissing Defendant Unknown Spouse of Joseph J. Wright from case

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Publication summons; Additional Text: Publication summons pertaining to service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Eau Claire County COC's Demand and Claim for Surplus

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer; Additional Text: Eau Claire County COC's

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Appearance; Additional Text: Notice of Appearance by Atty. Charles R. Ellefsen, III on behalf of Defendant Eau Claire County Clerk of Circuit Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Lis pendens; Additional Text: Notice of

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 105971, Payable Number: 255122, Receipt Number: 21R 007799, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Note

    Read MoreRead Less