This case was last updated from La Crosse County Courts on 01/22/2022 at 13:20:32 (UTC).

PROGRESSIVE UNIVERSAL INSURANCE COMPANY vs. ASHLEY LITTLEJOHN

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 PROGRESSIVE UNIVERSAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against ASHLEY LITTLEJOHN. This case was filed in La Crosse County Courts, La Crosse County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Levine, Elliott M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0176

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    La Crosse, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Levine, Elliott M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROGRESSIVE UNIVERSAL INSURANCE COMPANY

5920 Landerbrook Drive

Mayfield Heights, OH 44124

Defendant

LITTLEJOHN, ASHLEY

Onalaska, WI 54650

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anderson, Jennifer L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certification of judgment; Additional Text: to revoke DL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 008217, Payable Number: 186629, Receipt Number: 21R 013418, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from Atty Hendricks filing NEJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Letter to Amend Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Court Official: Levine, Elliott M; Additional Text: proposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Court Official: Levine, Elliott M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judgment; Court Official: Levine, Elliott M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for judgment; Court Official: Levine, Elliott M

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of no answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Amended summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of non-service; Additional Text: on Ashley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $167.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 002726, Payable Number: 182113, Receipt Number: 21R 004385, Amount: $167.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anderson, Jennifer L.