This case was last updated from Waupaca County Courts on 02/03/2022 at 07:42:12 (UTC).

Premier Community Bank vs. Shaila Y. Lopez

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 Premier Community Bank filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Shaila Y Lopez. This case was filed in Waupaca County Courts, Waupaca County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Nielsen, Troy L, Vedral, Doreen and Tews, Terrie. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0199

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Waupaca, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Nielsen, Troy L

Vedral, Doreen

Tews, Terrie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Premier Community Bank

230 Mavis Road

Marion, WI 54950

Defendant

Lopez, Shaila Y.

Clintonville, WI 54929

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Meyer, Michael C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Tews, Terrie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Nielsen, Troy L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for replevin; County: WAUPACA; Case number: 2021SC000199; Caption: Premier Community Bank vs. Shaila Y. Lopez; Total Amount: $1988.36; Property/Remarks: Replevin judgment entered for return of: 2011 Ford Taurus 4DR Sedan, VIN# 1FAHP2DW7BG149501; Judgment Party; Party Name: Shaila Y. Lopez; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 51 West 14th Street, Clintonville, WI 54929 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Premier Community Bank; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 230 Mavis Road, Marion, WI 54950 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1620.71; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $117.65; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $100.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letter of appearance by attorney; Additional Text: Letter of Appearance and request for Judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judgment of replevin; Court Official: Nielsen, Troy L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Nielsen, Troy L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Vedral, Doreen; Additional Text: There was no appearance by the defendant. Judgment will be entered when Atty. Meyer files a letter of appearance and declaration of non-military service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default/uncontested judgment, awaiting final paper; Court Official: Nielsen, Troy L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Additional Text: Copies returned to Attorney for personal service on defendant(s).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 007067, Payable Number: 153259, Receipt Number: 21R 003212, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meyer, Michael C.