This case was last updated from Dodge County Courts on 02/02/2022 at 18:46:53 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs. REBECCA N BARNETT

Case Summary

On 03/10/2021 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against REBECCA N BARNETT. This case was filed in Dodge County Courts, Dodge County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Pfitzinger, Brian A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0310

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Dodge, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Pfitzinger, Brian A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Po Box 12914

Norfolk, VA 23541

Defendant

BARNETT, REBECCA N

Randolph, WI 53956-9658

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paleka, Kayla A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice; Additional Text: Walmart Stores, Inc $2895.25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 093881, Payable Number: 234816, Receipt Number: 21R 017301, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 093881, Payable Number: 234816, Receipt Number: 21R 017301, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 060977, Payable Number: 231134, Receipt Number: 21R 010214, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: DODGE; Case number: 2021SC000310; Caption: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs. REBECCA N BARNETT; Total Amount: $2890.25; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: REBECCA N BARNETT; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: N9528 COUNTY ROAD C, Randolph, WI 53956-9658 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: PO BOX 12914, Norfolk, VA 23541 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $2715.75; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $60.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Pfitzinger, Brian A.; Court Reporter: Mountin, Maria; Additional Text: Attorney Robert Nailen in court for Plaintiff PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC. Defendant REBECCA N BARNETT not in court. Plaintiff waives attorney fees. Default judgment granted for amount requested plus applicable court costs.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Pfitzinger, Brian A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Pfitzinger, Brian A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Pfitzinger, Brian A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Pfitzinger, Brian A.; Additional Text: Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: $60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Court Official: Pfitzinger, Brian A.; Additional Text: $2715.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 020711, Payable Number: 227555, Receipt Number: 21R 004456, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Exhibit to Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paleka, Kayla A