This case was last updated from Kenosha County Courts on 02/01/2022 at 17:06:10 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs. JORDAN BEST

Case Summary

On 02/15/2021 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against JORDAN BEST. This case was filed in Kenosha County Courts, Kenosha County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Dowse, Geoffrey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0482

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kenosha, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Dowse, Geoffrey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Po Box 12914

Norfolk, VA 23541

Defendant

BEST, JORDAN

Kenosha, WI 53142

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paleka, Kayla A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: email from Rausch requesting dismissal - no service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: Dowse, Geoffrey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Attempted service; Additional Text: of Amended Summons and Complaint as to Jordan Best ($60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Amended summons and complaint; Court Official: Dowse, Geoffrey; Additional Text: $942.73

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Attempted service; Additional Text: of Summons and Complaint as to Jordan Best ($60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: email from Rausch requesting adjournment to 04-19-2021 at 2:30 p.m. - service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: zoom instructions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Additional Text: of proper attire and decorum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Zoom Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Court Official: Dowse, Geoffrey; Additional Text: $942.73

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 110247, Payable Number: 316814, Receipt Number: 21R 003871, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paleka, Kayla A