This case was last updated from Chippewa County Courts on 02/06/2022 at 21:15:25 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs. DEBBIE HAMMAN

Case Summary

On 08/16/2021 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against DEBBIE HAMMAN. This case was filed in Chippewa County Courts, Chippewa County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Hoel, Kari S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0599

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Chippewa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Hoel, Kari S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Po Box 12914

Norfolk, VA 23541

Defendant

HAMMAN, DEBBIE

Chippewa Falls, WI 54729-7108

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Fingert, Evan R

Thielhelm, Paul H.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Full satisfaction; Amount: $1038.29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Satisfaction of judgment; Additional Text: Satisfaction filed after business hours on 12-27-2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Satisfaction of judgment fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 186376, Payable Number: 159497, Receipt Number: 21R 019317, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Attorney Paul Thielhelm for plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Hoel, Kari S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Hoel, Kari S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: CHIPPEWA; Case number: 2021SC000599; Caption: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs. DEBBIE HAMMAN; Total Amount: $1038.29; Satisfaction: Full; Property/Remarks: Default judgment.; Judgment Party; Party Name: DEBBIE HAMMAN; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 15964 52ND AVE, Chippewa Falls, WI 54729-7108 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: PO BOX 12914, Norfolk, VA 23541 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $921.79; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Civil Judgement Events; Date: 2021-12-28; Type: Full satisfaction; Amount: $1038.29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Hoel, Kari S.; Additional Text: hearing; Attorney Michael Koehn appeared for plaintiff; defendant did not appear; default judgment granted; minutes filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Hoel, Kari S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Court Official: Hoel, Kari S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 122668, Payable Number: 156445, Receipt Number: 21R 012640, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thielhelm, Paul H.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fingert, Evan R