This case was last updated from Sheboygan County Courts on 02/01/2022 at 02:22:02 (UTC).

Plaza Services, LLC vs. MADELINE OLIVIER

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 Plaza Services, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against MADELINE OLIVIER. This case was filed in Sheboygan County Courts, Sheboygan County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Schaubel, Susan and Gavic, Jorv R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0124

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sheboygan, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Schaubel, Susan

Gavic, Jorv R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Plaza Services, LLC

110 Hammond Drive, Suite 110

Atlanta, GA 30328

Defendant

OLIVIER, MADELINE

Sheboygan, WI 53081

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Johnson, Seth Elijah

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan; Additional Text: stipulated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulated dismissal; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for dismissal; Additional Text: stipulated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Responsible court official changed; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Amended summons and complaint; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 000926, Payable Number: 349295, Receipt Number: 21R 001508, Amount: $2.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for OLIVIER, MADELINE; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for MADELINE OLIVIER Current: 417A Ontario Ave, Sheboygan, WI 53081 (Effective: 01-25-2021) Prior: 121 LEWIS ST, River Falls, WI 54022 US

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from ACC to all Litigants

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $22.0; Additional Text: 21R 001567

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Gavic, Jorv R.; Additional Text: Change of Venue - case originated in Pierce County. To Sheboygan County Event type was converted from OCV to OR. Received event OR from Pierce County for case #2021SC000009 Document(s) associated with source event: Order for Change of Venue.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Transmittal fee paid; Amount: $15.0; Additional Text: Change of Venue - case originated in Pierce County. 21R 000317 Received event TFP from Pierce County for case #2021SC000009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Received documents; Additional Text: Change of Venue - case originated in Pierce County. Cover letter with transmittal fees Received event RECD from Pierce County for case #2021SC000009 Document(s) associated with source event: Cover Letter with transmittal fees.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: Change of Venue - case originated in Pierce County. Order for Change of Venue Received event PORDR from Pierce County for case #2021SC000009 Document(s) associated with source event: Proposed - Order for Change of Venue.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of motion; Additional Text: Change of Venue - case originated in Pierce County. Plaintiff's Notice of Motion to Change Venue - Filed by Attorney Meghan P. MacKelly Received event NM from Pierce County for case #2021SC000009 Document(s) associated with source event: Plaintiff's Notice of Motion to Change Venue.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: Change of Venue - case originated in Pierce County. on Summons & Complaint, Notice of Hearing & E-filing Notice unto Madeline Olivier (Return to Sender/Not Deliverable as Addressed/Unable to Forward) Received event RUMS from Pierce County for case #2021SC000009 Document(s) associated with source event: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Court Official: Gavic, Jorv R.; Additional Text: Change of Venue - case originated in Pierce County. Copies mailed to party by Clerk Received event SCSM from Pierce County for case #2021SC000009 Document(s) associated with source event: Electronic Filing Notice - OLIVIER, MADELINE, Summons and Complaint.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing; Additional Text: Change of Venue - case originated in Pierce County. Received event CIEF from Pierce County for case #2021SC000009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Change of Venue - case originated in Pierce County. Adjustment Number: 21A 000014, Payable Number: 62942, Receipt Number: 21R 000019, Amount: $116.50 Received event FFP from Pierce County for case #2021SC000009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: Change of Venue - case originated in Pierce County. Madeline Oliver; includes Status Report Received event DNMS from Pierce County for case #2021SC000009 Document(s) associated with source event: Declaration of nonmilitary service.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Change of Venue - case originated in Pierce County. Return date on February 3, 2021 at 09:40 am; mailed to party with phone-in instructions. Received event NOH from Pierce County for case #2021SC000009 Document(s) associated with source event: Notice of Hearing.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less