This case was last updated from Columbia County Wisconsin Courts on 02/08/2022 at 23:49:28 (UTC).

Paul Properties vs. Michael Hayes et al

Case Summary

On 10/26/2021 Paul Properties filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Michael Hayes. This case was filed in Columbia County Wisconsin Courts, Columbia County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Hepler, Todd J and Von Hoff, Andrea E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0718

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Hepler, Todd J

Von Hoff, Andrea E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paul Properties

Po Box 864

Portage, WI 53901

Defendants

Hayes, Michael

Portage, WI 53901

Jordan, Nicholas

Portage, WI 53901

Connor, Chynna

Portage, WI 53901

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Additional Text: 11/16/21 Nicholas Jordan was personally served the Writ of Restitution $20.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Statement of Nicholas Jordan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Additional Text: 11/17/21 Michael Hayes was personally served the Writ of Restitution $123.35

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Writ returned satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Statement of Michael Hayes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Additional Text: 11/16/21 Chynna Connor was personally served the Writ of Restitution $48.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Statement of Chynna Connor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for eviction; County: COLUMBIA; Case number: 2021SC000718; Caption: Paul Properties vs. Michael Hayes et al; Property/Remarks: 117 E Franklin St Portage, WI 53901 Writ applied for. The defendant shall notify the court of new address. Plaintiff is to provide the court and defendant with an itemized statement of the amount owed within 90 days; thereafter a hearing on damages will be scheduled.; Judgment Party; Party Name: Paul Properties; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: PO Box 864, Portage, WI 53901; Judgment Party; Party Name: Michael Hayes; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 117 E Franklin St, Portage, WI 53901; Judgment Party; Party Name: Nicholas Jordan; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 117 E Franklin St, Portage, WI 53901; Judgment Party; Party Name: Chynna Connor; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 117 E Franklin St, Portage, WI 53901

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Receipt; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: 21R 015324

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: 11/3/21 Michael Hayes was personally served the Summons and Complaint $120.00

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Eviction return date; Court Official: Von Hoff, Andrea E; Court Reporter: Hughes, Tiffany; Additional Text: Donn Paul appeared in court on behalf of the Plaintiff Paul Properties, Defendant Michael Hayes not in court, Defendant Nicholas Jordan not in court, Defendant Chynna Connor not in court. Default judgment due to non-appearance by the defendants. Writ may be applied for. Case remains open 90 days for plaintiff to file damages.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Hepler, Todd J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Writ of restitution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Additional Text: 11/3/21 Michael Hayes was personally served the Summons and Complaint $120.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $94.5; Additional Text: 21R 014700

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Complaint - Smalls Claims

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: as to Nicholas Jordan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: as to Michael Hayes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: as to Chynna Connor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    Read MoreRead Less