This case was last updated from Columbia County Wisconsin Courts on 02/09/2022 at 08:33:34 (UTC).

Paul Properties vs. Florence Hunter

Case Summary

On 11/09/2021 Paul Properties filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Florence Hunter. This case was filed in Columbia County Wisconsin Courts, Columbia County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Voigt, W. Andrew and Von Hoff, Andrea E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0731

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Voigt, W. Andrew

Von Hoff, Andrea E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paul Properties

Po Box 864

Portage, WI 53901

Defendant

Hunter, Florence

Portage, WI 53901

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Additional Text: 12/4/21 Florence Hunter was personally served the Writ of Restitution $123.35

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Writ returned satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Statement of Florence Hunter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Writ of restitution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Voigt, W. Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Writ of restitution; Additional Text: Eviction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for eviction; County: COLUMBIA; Case number: 2021SC000731; Caption: Paul Properties vs. Florence Hunter; Property/Remarks: 531 E Conant St #2 Portage, WI 53901 Writ applied for The defendant shall notify the court of new address. Plaintiff is to provide the court and defendant with an itemized statement of the amount owed within 90 days; thereafter a hearing on damages will be scheduled.; Judgment Party; Party Name: Paul Properties; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: PO Box 864, Portage, WI 53901; Judgment Party; Party Name: Florence Hunter; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 531 E Conant St #2, Portage, WI 53901

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Writ of restitution fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: 21R 016077

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Eviction return date; Court Official: Von Hoff, Andrea E; Additional Text: Plaintiff Paul Properties appeared in court, Defendant Florence Hunter appeared in court. re: eviction. defendant does not dispute, lease breached and rent not paid. Plaintiff entitled to judgment of eviction as a matter of law. Writ may be applied for. Case remains open 90 days for plaintiff to file damages.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Additional Text: 11/17/21 Florence Hunter was personally served the Summons and Complaint Eviction $48.10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $94.5; Additional Text: 21R 015432

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Complaint - Smalls Claims

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less