This case was last updated from Wood County Wisconsin Courts on 02/02/2022 at 22:15:01 (UTC).

Northern Development Group LLC vs. Dallas Holder et al

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 Northern Development Group LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Dallas Holder. This case was filed in Wood County Wisconsin Courts, Wood County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Kreuser, Jacalyn A, Weymouth, Richard and Potter, Gregory J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0280

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Wood, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Kreuser, Jacalyn A

Weymouth, Richard

Potter, Gregory J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Northern Development Group LLC

Maples Mhc, 4610 8Th Street South

Wisconsin Rapids, WI 54494

Defendants

Holder, Dallas

Waupaca, WI 54981-9406

Deford, Crystal

Waupaca, WI 54981-9406

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Holder, Dallas; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Dallas Holder Current: N1891 Cty Rd E, Waupaca, WI 54981-9406 United States (Effective: 06-18-2021) Prior: 4610 8th Street South Lot 100, Wisconsin Rapids, WI 54494 US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Deford, Crystal; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Crystal Deford Current: N1891 Cty Rd E, Waupaca, WI 54981-9406 United States (Effective: 06-18-2021) Prior: 4610 8th Street South Lot 100, Wisconsin Rapids, WI 54494 US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: Crystal Deford; NEJ/FDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: Dallas Holder; NEJ/FDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: WOOD; Case number: 2021SC000280; Caption: Northern Development Group LLC vs. Dallas Holder et al; Total Amount: $695.8; Judgment Party; Party Name: Dallas Holder; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: N1891 Cty Rd E, Waupaca, WI 54981-9406; Judgment Party; Party Name: Crystal Deford; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: N1891 Cty Rd E, Waupaca, WI 54981-9406; Judgment Party; Party Name: Northern Development Group LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: Maples MHC, 4610 8th Street South, Wisconsin Rapids, WI 54494 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $695.8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Damage hearing; Court Official: Weymouth, Richard; Court Reporter: TAPE REPORTER; Additional Text: 01:18 PM Plaintiff Northern Development Group LLC in court Teresa Relken. Defendant Crystal Deford not in court. Defendant Dallas Holder not in court. Court grants judgment $695.80 which includes costs and filing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judgment after court trial; Court Official: Weymouth, Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Weymouth, Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Weymouth, Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit; Additional Text: Damage List

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of non-service; Additional Text: $75; Dallas Holder; S&C Eviction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: POsted on 03/24/21 and mailed on 03/24/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of non-service; Additional Text: $75; Crystal Deford; S&C Eviction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Posted on 03/24/21 and mailed on 03/24/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Amount: $370.45; Additional Text: 4610 8th St S Site 100, WRW 54494

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 002894, Payable Number: 125193, Receipt Number: 21R 002673, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Additional Text: 5-Day Notice to pay rent or Vacate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: 5 Day Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less