This case was last updated from St. Croix County Courts on 02/03/2022 at 07:33:46 (UTC).

Nilssen's Foods vs. Tyler Wilson Isaacson

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 Nilssen's Foods filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Tyler Wilson Isaacson. This case was filed in St. Croix County Courts, St. Croix County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Waterman, R. Michael and Heckmann, Timothy C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0305

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    St. Croix, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Waterman, R. Michael

Heckmann, Timothy C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nilssen's Foods

Cumberland, WI 54829

Defendant

Isaacson, Tyler Wilson

New Richmond, WI 54017

Garnishee

Prime Communicatons

12550 Reed Rd Suite 100

Sugar Land, TX 77478

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peterson, Christina L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice; Additional Text: GD: Prime Communications. Filed by Atty PL. Sealed copies electronically to Atty. kak

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 086821, Payable Number: 233605, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 086821, Payable Number: 233605, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 054263, Payable Number: 230513, Amount: $5.00 Filed by J. Albrecht. kma

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: ST CROIX; Case number: 2021SC000305; Caption: Nilssen's Foods vs. Tyler Wilson Isaacson; Total Amount: $1186.44; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Tyler Wilson Isaacson; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1276 Pinewood Trail, New Richmond, WI 54017 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Nilssen's Foods; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1170 2nd Avenue, P.O. Box 66, Cumberland, WI 54829 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $902.44; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $116.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $50.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Garnishment costs; Amount: $112.5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Telephone status conference; Court Official: Heckmann, Timothy C.; Additional Text: 02:15 PM CO: Timothy C. Heckmann, Clerk: K Kittel. Attorney Christina L. Peterson not in court. Defendant Tyler Wilson Isaacson not in court. .Court notes 2:16 pm; one call in zoom, does not respond when asked to address their appearance. Court issues a 20 day dismissal. Court recalls matter at 2:22 pm with Atty Peterson on the zoom line. Court vacates the 20 day dismissal. Court notes 4/27 hearing. Atty Peterson makes statements and asks for judgment to be entered. Court grants judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Heckmann, Timothy C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Heckmann, Timothy C.; Additional Text: 20 Day - VACATED. kak

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Heckmann, Timothy C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Heckmann, Timothy C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Heckmann, Timothy C.; Additional Text: 01:48 PM FCC Crt Comm: Timothy C. Heckmann, Clerk: Benoy Attorney Christina L. Peterson appeared by video means for Plaintiff Nilssen's Foods. Defendant Tyler Wilson Isaacson in court. DE does not recall writing the checks. Atty Peterson states she has sent copies. DE accepted the certified copies. Atty Peterson will resend through 1st class mail. Telephone status conference scheduled for May 25, 2021 at 02:15 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing; Court Official: Waterman, R. Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Telephone status conference on May 25, 2021 at 02:15 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing; Additional Text: of copy of all checks written by DE to the PL via USPS on 4/27/21. Filed by Atty Peterson. kak

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Additional Text: Service of Summons and Complaint by regular mail. Filed by the PL. ec: PL, c: DE w/zoom info. kak ($902.44)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 031792, Payable Number: 227673, Receipt Number: 21R 004468, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: for Tyler Isaacson, filed by Atty Peterson. kak

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peterson, Christina L.