This case was last updated from Wood County Wisconsin Courts on 01/23/2022 at 01:52:55 (UTC).

NewRez LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing et al vs. The Estate of James D. Wypych

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 NewRez LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against The Estate of James D Wypych. This case was filed in Wood County Wisconsin Courts, Wood County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Brazeau, Nicholas J., Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0163

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Wood, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Brazeau, Nicholas J., Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NewRez LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing

55 Beattie Place, Suite 110

Greenville, SC 29601

Defendant

The Estate of James D. Wypych

C/O Russell J. Karnes, Special Admin, 330 E. Kilbourn Avenue, #1170

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Not Yet Classified

Federal Home Loan Mortagage Corpiration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Hillmann, Shawn R

Thoms, Emily E.

Gratz, Codi C.

Comella, Matthew

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order confirming sale; Court Official: Brazeau, Nicholas J., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Confirmation of sale; Court Official: Brazeau, Nicholas J., Jr.; Court Reporter: Peterson, Michelle; Additional Text: 08:31 AM Attorney Matthew Comella appeared by phone means for Plaintiff NewRez LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. Plaintiff is moving for an amended judgment amount. Court approves the sheriff's sale and grants the amended judgment amount.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of mailing; Additional Text: Confirmation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of motion, motion; Additional Text: to confirm sheriff's sale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit in support of motion; Additional Text: to confirm sheriff's sale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order confirming sale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Sheriff's deed; Additional Text: E-Receipt & $30 Ck #109398 made payable to WC ROD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: Sale of Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Sheriff's report of sale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Assignment; Additional Text: of Judgement and Bid

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for judgment/prop. judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit in support of motion; Additional Text: for Judgment of Foreclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Admission of service; Additional Text: Estate of James Wypych - signed May 13, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Lis pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 004842, Payable Number: 126366, Receipt Number: 21R 004533, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hillmann, Shawn R