This case was last updated from Outagamie County Courts on 02/02/2022 at 20:53:25 (UTC).

New Anesthesiology, S.C. vs. JEREMY JENNERJOHN

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 New Anesthesiology, S C filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against JEREMY JENNERJOHN. This case was filed in Outagamie County Courts, Outagamie County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Budiac, Maureen Roberts. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0757

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Outagamie, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Budiac, Maureen Roberts

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

New Anesthesiology, S.C.

Brookfield, WI 53005

Defendant

JENNERJOHN, JEREMY

Hortonville, WI 54944

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mackelly, Meghan Patricia

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 130269, Payable Number: 396668, Receipt Number: 21R 247465, Amount: $5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Budiac, Maureen Roberts

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Budiac, Maureen Roberts

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: OUTAGAMIE; Case number: 2021SC000757; Caption: New Anesthesiology, S.C. vs. JEREMY JENNERJOHN; Total Amount: $3238.84; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: JEREMY JENNERJOHN; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: W8046 Hillview Rd, Hortonville, WI 54944; Judgment Party; Party Name: New Anesthesiology, S.C.; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 225 S Executive Dr First Floor, Brookfield, WI 53005 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $2848.34; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $121.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Other; Amount: $20.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Budiac, Maureen Roberts; Additional Text: Atty Seth Johnson appeared by phone for plaintiff; defendant appeared by phone. Court grants judgment in favor of plaintiff.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Budiac, Maureen Roberts

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: of Amended S&C on defendant on 4-3-21; $58

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for JENNERJOHN, JEREMY; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for JEREMY JENNERJOHN Current: W8046 Hillview Rd, Hortonville, WI 54944 (Effective: 03-29-2021) Prior: 32 FIVE OAKS DR, Menasha, WI 54952 US

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of non-service; Additional Text: on Jeremy JennerJohn / $63.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Amended summons and complaint; Additional Text: Money $ 2848.34; Personal Service Required

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Additional Text: to parties regarding their appearances at Return Date

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by private process; Additional Text: Money $2848.34

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 091049, Payable Number: 394216, Receipt Number: 21R 242623, Amount: $114.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mackelly, Meghan Patricia