This case was last updated from Rock County Courts on 08/21/2021 at 13:24:17 (UTC).

Neighborly Home Rentals vs. Scarlett Owens

Case Summary

On 06/22/2021 Neighborly Home Rentals filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Scarlett Owens. This case was filed in Rock County Courts, Rock County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Meyer, Stephen D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1548

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Rock, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Meyer, Stephen D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Neighborly Home Rentals

Po Box 293, C/O Rede2 Property Management

Janesville, WI 53547

Defendant

Owens, Scarlett

Beloit, WI 53511

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • HearingDescription: Rent and damages; Court Official: Meyer, Stephen D.; Location: Video Conference: Zoom; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Received documents; Additional Text: Certified Mail Receipt dated August 10, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Damage hearing; Court Official: Meyer, Stephen D.; Additional Text: 10:10 AM Plaintiff Neighborly Home Rentals by Brenda Moller appeared by video means. Defendant Scarlett Owens not in court. This matter is adjourned for service. Rent and damages scheduled for August 25, 2021 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing; Court Official: Meyer, Stephen D.; Additional Text: Activity: Rent and damages Appearances by video/zoom: Court Official, Court Clerk, and all Parties referenced in hearing minutes as in court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Rent and damages on August 25, 2021 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Damage list; Additional Text: Damage list - $2200.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Rent and damages on August 11, 2021 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Owens, Scarlett; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Scarlett Owens Current: 1706 Calumet, Beloit, WI 53511 US (Effective: 07-14-2021) Prior: 1850 Grant St, Beloit, WI 53511 US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Eviction return date; Court Official: Meyer, Stephen D.; Additional Text: 08:53 AM Plaintiff Neighborly Home Rentals by Brenda Moller appeared by video means. Defendant Scarlett Owens appeared by video means. Plaintiff moves to dismiss the eviction portion of the claim; so ordered. Rent and damages scheduled for August 11, 2021 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing; Court Official: Meyer, Stephen D.; Additional Text: Activity: Eviction return date Appearances by video/zoom: Court Official, Court Clerk, and all Parties referenced in hearing minutes as in court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of posting; Additional Text: Document(s): Summons and Complaint with eFiling Notice, Declaration of nonmilitary service, Notice of Non Renewal of Lease posted residential to Defendant Scarlett Owens on July 5, 2021. Fees: $45.00. *Ok SDM*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Eviction return date on July 14, 2021 at 08:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Additional Text: Pending service. Eviction and claim for money $TBD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 495419, Payable Number: 249621, Receipt Number: 21R 020735, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: Defendant: Scarlet Owens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: 30 Day Notice of Non-Renewal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Declaration of CARES Act: Eviction

    Read MoreRead Less