This case was last updated from Chippewa County Courts on 01/21/2022 at 16:56:39 (UTC).

Navy Federal Credit Union vs. Amber A Schmidt

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 Navy Federal Credit Union filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Amber A Schmidt. This case was filed in Chippewa County Courts, Chippewa County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Isaacson, James M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0012

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Chippewa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Isaacson, James M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Navy Federal Credit Union

Po Box 3300

Merrifield, VA 22119

Defendant

Schmidt, Amber A

Chippewa Falls, WI 54729

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hiller, James Alan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from Clerk of Courts re docket fee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • HearingDescription: Motion hearing; Court Official: Isaacson, James M; Location: Chippewa County Courthouse, Branch 2; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: CHIPPEWA; Case number: 2021CV000012; Caption: Navy Federal Credit Union vs. Amber A Schmidt; Total Amount: $15229.93; Property/Remarks: Default judgment.; Judgment Party; Party Name: Navy Federal Credit Union; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: PO Box 3300, Merrifield, VA 22119 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Amber A Schmidt; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 19019 62nd Ave., Chippewa Falls, WI 54729 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $14596.58; Costs/Amount; Description: Civil filing fee; Amount: $293.35; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $90.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $250.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for judgment; Court Official: Isaacson, James M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Isaacson, James M; Additional Text: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Isaacson, James M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: Sent for review.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of motion, motion; Additional Text: for Default Judgment; filed by Attorney James A. Hiller

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit in support of motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing; Additional Text: of Notice of Motion for Default Judgment, Affidavit in Support of Judgment, Affidavit of Plaintiff or Plaintiff's Representative, and proposed Order for Judgment to defendant Amber A. Schmidt on 03-29-2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for judgment; Additional Text: Sent for review.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: Sent for review. Unable to edit; resubmit in Word.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Amber Schmidt was served on 02/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Additional Text: filed by Attorney James Hiller

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 014976, Payable Number: 151823, Receipt Number: 21R 000842, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hiller, James Alan